Bates v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Debra Bates
Defendant: Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv00793
Filed: March 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Richard N. Bien added to party Reliastar Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) by Reliastar Life Insurance Company.(Bien, Richard)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 6/9/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 6/2/2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #3-1) is due 6/2/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 4/15/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
April 10, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Debra Bates. Reliastar Life Insurance Company served on 4/7/2020, answer due 4/28/2020. (Bulger, Thomas)
March 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
March 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reliastar Life Insurance Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7218195)Attorney Thomas A. Bulger added to party Debra Bates(pty:pla), filed by Debra Bates. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Proposed summons)(Bulger, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bates v. Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra Bates
Represented By: Thomas A. Bulger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliastar Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Richard N. Bien
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?