Burnside et al v. Allergan Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Burnside and Carol Burnside
Defendant: Inamed Corporation, Allergan Inc., Allergan PLC and Allergan USA, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00812
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the District of New Jersey, pursuant to the Certified Copy of the Transfer Order InterdistrictTransfer_NJD@njd.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-7) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 20-cv-00812 KMT, to the District of New Jersey, to become part of MDL 2921 by Clerk on 4/7/2020. (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter) (evana, )
March 27, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carol Burnside, Stephen Burnside. Allergan USA, Inc. waiver sent on 3/27/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (McCormick, Brian)
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carol Burnside, Stephen Burnside. Allergan Inc. waiver sent on 3/27/2020, answer due 5/26/2020. (McCormick, Brian)
March 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/1/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 5/25/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 3/26/2020. (ksena)
March 25, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX094533 (alave, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Brian J. McCormick, Jr added to party Carol Burnside(pty:pla), Attorney Brian J. McCormick, Jr added to party Stephen Burnside(pty:pla), filed by Carol Burnside, Stephen Burnside. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Allergan Inc., #3 Summons Allergan plc, #4 Summons Allergan USA, #5 Summons Inamed Corporation)(McCormick, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnside et al v. Allergan Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Burnside
Represented By: Brian J. McCormick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol Burnside
Represented By: Brian J. McCormick, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inamed Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?