Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC v. Amika Capital Investments Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC
Defendant: Hansaben J. Patel, Amika Capital Investments Inc., Parul A. Amin and Atulkumar R. Amin
Case Number: 1:2020cv00874
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to the notice of dismissal or stipulation to dismiss filed in this case Text Only Entry (lgale, )
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case Without Prejudice by Plaintiff Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC (Tyler, Michael)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/6/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/15/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/22/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 attachment 1, #2 attacgnebt 2) (nmarb, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-874-KLM (angar, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX0904595 (cmadr, )
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Defendants Amika Capital Investments Inc., A.R. Amin, P.A. Amin, H.J. Patel by Plaintiff Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC. (Attachments: #1 Summons A.R. Amin, #2 Summons P.A. Amin, #3 Summons H.J. Patel)(Tyler, Michael)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 Exhibits in Support of #1 Complaint, by Plaintiff Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Franchise Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Guaranty, #3 Exhibit C - Jan 9 2019 Notice Letter, #4 Exhibit D - Mar 6 2019 Notice Letter, #5 Exhibit E - May 7 2019 Notice Letter, #6 Exhibit F - Systems Fees & Finance Charges, #7 Exhibit G - LD Calculations, #8 Exhibit H - Mar 30 2020 Demand Letter, #9 Exhibit I - Mar 30 2020 Notice of Request for Mediation, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tyler, Michael)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amika Capital Investments Inc., Atulkumar R Amin, Parul A. Amin, Hansaben J. Patel (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Michael W. Tyler added to party Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC(pty:pla), filed by Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC.(Tyler, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC v. Amika Capital Investments Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hansaben J. Patel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amika Capital Investments Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parul A. Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atulkumar R. Amin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Holiday Hospitality Franchising LLC
Represented By: Michael W. Tyler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?