City and County of Denver v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: City and County of Denver
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, JUUL Labs, Inc., Nu Mark LLC, Altria Group, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Eonsmoke LLC and PAX Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00896
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the Northern District of California pursuant to the Certified copy of the Conditional Transfer Order ecfhelpdesk@cand.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 20-cv-00896 SKC, to the Northern District of California, to become part of MDL 2913, by Clerk on 4/23/2020. (evana, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 8 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX094596. (alave, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Eonsmoke LLC, JUUL Labs, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Nu Mark LLC, filed by City and County of Denver.(Kawamoto, Dean)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted copy of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff City and County of Denver.. (Kawamoto, Dean) Modified to add document title on 4/2/2020 (cmadr, ).
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff City and County of Denver. (Kawamoto, Dean)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Notice of Related Cases by Dean Noburu Kawamoto on behalf of City and County of Denver (Kawamoto, Dean)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Eonsmoke LLC, JUUL Labs, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Nu Mark LLC (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Dean Noburu Kawamoto added to party City and County of Denver(pty:pla), filed by City and County of Denver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kawamoto, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City and County of Denver v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City and County of Denver
Represented By: Dean Noburu Kawamoto
Represented By: Gretchen Freeman Cappio
Represented By: Derek William Loeser
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Mulbarger
Represented By: Edward James Gorman
Represented By: Kristin M. Bronson
Represented By: Alison Smith Gaffney
Represented By: Renee A. Goble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu Mark LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eonsmoke LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAX Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?