Eagle County v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Eagle County
Defendant: Nu Mark LLC, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, JUUL Labs, Inc., Altria Group, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Eonsmoke LLC and PAX Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00901
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 15 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the Northern District of California pursuant to the Northern District of California. ecfhelpdesk@cand.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 14 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 20-cv-00901 CMA-GPG, to the Northern District of California, to become part of MDL 2913, by Clerk on 4/23/2020. (evana, )
April 7, 2020 Filing 13 CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to 11 Order. This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-00901-CMA-GPG. (Text Only Entry) (tsher, )
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/7/2020. The Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2020 is VACATED. (tsher, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Eagle County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 20-cv-00901-CMA-GPG. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/6/2020. Text Only Entry (cmalc1)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 4/6/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/3/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (tsher, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Plaintiff's Motion to Restrict Access to Unredacted Complaint. ECF Doc. # 4 shall have a Level 1 Restriction. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/6/2020. Text Only Entry (cmalc1)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/6/2020. Text Only Entry (cmalc1)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX094597. (alave, )
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted copy of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Eagle County.. (Kawamoto, Dean) Modified to add document title on 4/2/2020 (cmadr, ).
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Eagle County. (Kawamoto, Dean)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Notice of Related Cases by Dean Noburu Kawamoto on behalf of Eagle County (Kawamoto, Dean)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Eonsmoke LLC, JUUL Labs, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Nu Mark LLC (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Dean Noburu Kawamoto added to party Eagle County(pty:pla), filed by Eagle County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kawamoto, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eagle County v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu Mark LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eonsmoke LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAX Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eagle County
Represented By: Dean Noburu Kawamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?