Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, The v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson and Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, The
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, JUUL Labs, Inc., Nu Mark LLC, Altria Group, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Eonsmoke LLC and PAX Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00902
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the Northern District of California pursuant to the Certified copy of the Conditional Transfer Order. ecfhelpdesk@cand.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 11 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 20-cv-00902 CMA-NYW, to the Northern District of California, to become part of MDL 2913, by Clerk on 4/23/2020. (evana, )
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/20/20 Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/24/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Restrict. Doc. #4 , all exhibits attached thereto, and any orders that may reveal the contents of these documents shall have a Level 1 Restriction. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/6/2020. Text Only Entry(cmalc2)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference, and should be available for trial accordingly. FURTHER, Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the Court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 4/2/2020. Text Only Entry (cmalc2)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX094598. (alave, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted copy of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson.. (Kawamoto, Dean) Modified to add document title on 4/2/2020 (cmadr, ).
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson. (Kawamoto, Dean)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Notice of Related Cases by Dean Noburu Kawamoto on behalf of The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson (Kawamoto, Dean)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Redacted) against Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Eonsmoke LLC, JUUL Labs, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Nu Mark LLC (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Dean Noburu Kawamoto added to party The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson(pty:pla), filed by The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kawamoto, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, The v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson
Represented By: Dean Noburu Kawamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Jefferson, The
Represented By: Dean Noburu Kawamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu Mark LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eonsmoke LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAX Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?