Pitkin County v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Pitkin County
Defendant: Nu Mark LLC, Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, JUUL Labs, Inc., Altria Group, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Eonsmoke LLC and PAX Labs, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00915
Filed: April 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Filing 16 Interdistrict Transmittal of Documents via e-mail to the Northern District of California pursuant to the Certified copy of the Conditional Transfer Order. ecfhelpdesk@cand.uscourts.gov. Text Only Entry (evana, )
April 23, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFIED COPY OF THE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-28) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado, 20-cv-00915 RM-GPG, to the Northern District of California, to become part of MDL 2913, by Clerk on 4/23/2020. (evana, )
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/8/20 re: #12 Order Reassigning Case. Pursuant to #12 Order, the Scheduling Conference set for 7/22/20 at 10:00 AM is VACATED. (nmarb, )
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER taking under advisement #3 Motion for Leave to Restrict: ECF #4 SHALL remain restricted at Level 1 Restriction until further Order of this Court. Within twenty-one (21) days of service, all Defendants SHALL respond to the motion with their position as to the proposed restriction and redactions. So Ordered. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 4/8/20. Text Only Entry(GPG)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER. This matter has its factual nexus in Eagle County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a), and as approved by the Chief Judge of the Court, the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 20-cv-00915- RM-GPG. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/7/2020. (rvill, )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/6/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/15/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/22/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2, #3 Attachment 3) (nmarb, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM regarding #3 MOTION for Leave to Restrict filed by Pitkin County. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/6/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: With the assignment of this matter, the parties are advised that throughout this case they are expected to be familiar and comply with not only the Local Rules of this District, but also Judge Raymond P. Moore's Civil Practice Standards, which may be found at: http://www.cod.uscourts.gov/JudicialOfficers/ActiveArticleIIIJudges/HonRaymondPMoore.aspx. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/6/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/6/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
April 3, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX094619 (cmadr, )
April 2, 2020 Filing 4 RESTRICTED DOCUMENT - Level 1: Unredacted copy of #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Pitkin County.. (Kawamoto, Dean) Modified to add document title on 4/3/2020 (cmadr, ).
April 2, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Restrict by Plaintiff Pitkin County. (Kawamoto, Dean)
April 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSOCIATION Notice of Related Cases by Dean Noburu Kawamoto on behalf of Pitkin County (Kawamoto, Dean)
April 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Altria Client Services LLC, Altria Group Distribution Company, Altria Group, Inc., Eonsmoke LLC, JUUL Labs, Inc., Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd., Nu Mark LLC (Filing fee $ 400).Attorney Dean Noburu Kawamoto added to party Pitkin County(pty:pla), filed by Pitkin County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kawamoto, Dean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pitkin County v. JUUL Labs, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu Mark LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Client Services LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group Distribution Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JUUL Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Altria Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nu Mark Innovations, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eonsmoke LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PAX Labs, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pitkin County
Represented By: Dean Noburu Kawamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?