Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc. v. USA
Plaintiff: Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: United States of America and USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv00934
Filed: April 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 26:7422
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SECOND AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 7/7/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 6/29/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 5/7/2020. (ksena)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 AMENDED ORDER SETTING Scheduling Conference for 6/29/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 6/22/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/10/2020. (ksena)
April 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 6/22/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 6/15/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 4/7/2020. (ksena)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States of America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7236190)Attorney Daniel James Treuden added to party Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Treuden, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc. v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elite Oil Field Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel James Treuden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?