Eliason v. Shelby et al
Plaintiff: Brett L. Eliason and Brett Lynn Eliason
Defendant: Robert J. Shelby and Dustin B. Pead
Case Number: 1:2020cv00959
Filed: April 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: S Kato Crews
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1964
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER DENYING WITHOUT PREJUDICE #5 First Motion to Compel the President of the Church of Latter Day Saints; #9 First Motion for Summary Judgment; #11 Second Motion for Summary Judgment; #13 First Motion to Compel the United States. Discovery under Rule 26 as not commenced in this matter; indeed, the two Defendants in this matter, Robert J. Shelby and Dustin B. Pead, have been served or entered an appearance in this matter. Therefore, the Court finds that the relief sought by each of the four Motions referenced above is premature. The Court will entertain such Motions only after discovery begins in this matter. Thus, IT IS ORDERED these Motions are premature and DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, for all future filings, the parties listed in the case caption shall include only the named parties in this case. As of the date of this Order, those are Plaintiff Brett L. Eliason, and Defendants Robert J. Shelby and Dustin B. Pead. [See, e.g., Docket No. #16 at p. 1.] SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/20/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
May 15, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE REGARDING AVAILABILITY OF PRO SE CLINIC AND AVAILABLE COURT RESOURCES. Issued by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/15/2020. (skclc2)
May 11, 2020 Filing 15 Exhibits in Support OF RELATED UTAH CASE by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett)
May 11, 2020 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM regarding #13 First MOTION to Compel THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO DEFEND THE US CONSTITUTION filed by Brett Lynn Eliason. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/11/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
May 11, 2020 Filing 13 First MOTION to Compel THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA TO DEFEND THE US CONSTITUTION by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM regarding #11 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Defendants Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; its officers and leaders of the LDS Church; and the equity partners of the Law Office of Kirton McConkie filed by Brett Lynn Eliason. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 5/5/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 Second MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Defendants Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; its officers and leaders of the LDS Church; and the equity partners of the Law Office of Kirton McConkie by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 MEMORANDUM regarding #9 First MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Defendants Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; its officers and leaders of the LDS Church; and the equity partners of the Law Office of Kirton McConkie filed by Brett Lynn Eliason. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/29/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
April 29, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION for Summary Judgment against the Defendants Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints; its officers and leaders of the LDS Church; and the equity partners of the Law Office of Kirton McConkie by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett)
April 29, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM regarding #7 First MOTION for Joinder of additional Defendants as described on the attached which includes The Corporation of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and The United States Department of Justice filed by Brett Lynn Eliason. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/29/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Joinder of additional Defendants as described on the attached which includes The Corporation of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints and The United States Department of Justice by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 MEMORANDUM regarding #5 First MOTION to Compel The Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints filed by Brett Lynn Eliason. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/23/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 First MOTION to Compel The Corporation of The President of The Church of Jesus Christ of Latter-Day Saints by Plaintiff Brett Lynn Eliason. (Eliason, Brett)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews for all motions. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order, and (5) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/6/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
April 6, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (agarc, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
April 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Request of Injunction against Dustin B. Pead, and Robert J. Shelby (Filing Fee: $400.00; Receipt Number: COX094689), filed by Brett L. Eliason. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(agarc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eliason v. Shelby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert J. Shelby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin B. Pead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett L. Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brett Lynn Eliason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?