Gushcloud PTE LTD et al v. Henman et al
Plaintiff: Gushcloud International USA, Inc., Gushcloud Talent Agency, Inc. and Gushcloud PTE LTD
Defendant: WHE Agency, Inc. and Kenneth Henman
Case Number: 1:2020cv01063
Filed: April 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Gushcloud Talent Agency Pte. Ltd. for Gushcloud PTE LTD. (VanLandschoot, Leah)
June 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE re #13 Notice of Dismissal of Party, 12 Minute Order,, Supplemental Statement of Conferral by Defendant WHE Agency, Inc. (Starr, Bart)
June 1, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Kenneth Henman, filed by Gushcloud PTE LTD, Gushcloud Talent Agency, Inc., Gushcloud International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(VanLandschoot, Leah)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Party WHE Agency, Inc. by Plaintiffs Gushcloud International USA, Inc., Gushcloud PTE LTD, Gushcloud Talent Agency, Inc. (VanLandschoot, Leah)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon review of Defendant WHE's statement of conferral in its motion to dismiss #11 . Upon such review, it appears the parties require additional time to meaningfully confer. Accordingly it is ORDERED that: (1) the briefing on the motion to dismiss is stayed until further order of the Court; (2) the parties are granted leave until Monday, June 1, 2020, to confer as required by the Civil Practice Standards; and (3) by that date, June 1, Defendant shall file a supplemental statement of conferral. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/26/2020. (Text Only Entry) (rmsec )
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer by Defendant WHE Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of T. Willis, #2 Affidavit of K. Henman, #3 Affidavit of B. Starr)(Starr, Bart)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This matter is before the Court sua sponte upon consideration of Defendant WHE Agency, Inc's motion to dismiss #8 . While conferral on a Rule 12(b) motion is not required by the Local Rules, it is required by the Court's Civil Practice Standards. Accordingly, the motion #8 is stricken. If, after meaningful conferral, refiling of the motion is appropriate under the applicable rules and case law, Defendant WHE Agency, Inc. is granted leave to refile on or before Friday, May 22, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 5/19/2020. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
May 15, 2020 Filing 9 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Starr, Bart)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 STRICKEN MOTION to Dismiss UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2), 12(b)(3), AND 12(b)(6) OR TO TRANSFER UNDER 28 U.S.C. 1404 by Defendant WHE Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 Declaration of Tracy Willis in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 Declaration of Kenneth Henman in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 Declaration of Bart Starr in support of Motion to Dismiss)(Starr, Bart) Modified on 5/19/2020 (rmsec, ).
May 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Bart Alan Starr on behalf of WHE Agency, Inc.Attorney Bart Alan Starr added to party WHE Agency, Inc.(pty:dft) (Starr, Bart)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gushcloud PTE LTD, Gushcloud Talent Agency, Inc., Gushcloud International USA, Inc.. WHE Agency, Inc. served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. (VanLandschoot, Leah)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(2)(a) re #4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01063-RM. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs Gushcloud International USA, Inc., Gushcloud PTE LTD, Gushcloud Talent Agency, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(VanLandschoot, Leah)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (cmadr, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7252082)Attorney Leah P. VanLandschoot added to party Gushcloud International USA, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Leah P. VanLandschoot added to party Gushcloud PTE LTD(pty:pla), Attorney Leah P. VanLandschoot added to party Gushcloud Talent Agency, Inc.(pty:pla), filed by Gushcloud PTE LTD, Gushcloud Talent Agency, Inc., Gushcloud International USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(VanLandschoot, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gushcloud PTE LTD et al v. Henman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WHE Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Bart Alan Starr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Henman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gushcloud International USA, Inc.
Represented By: Leah P. VanLandschoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gushcloud Talent Agency, Inc.
Represented By: Leah P. VanLandschoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gushcloud PTE LTD
Represented By: Leah P. VanLandschoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?