Johnson v. Werts et al
Plaintiff: Jabari J. Johnson
Defendant: Werts, Padilla and Brubaker
Case Number: 1:2020cv01084
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE AND IMPOSITION OF MONETARY SANCTION. ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate this case and close the action because Plaintiff has failed to comply with the sanction orders entered inJohnson v. Hawkins, et al., No. 19-cv-03730-LTB, ECF No. 10 (D. Colo. Mar. 4, 2020), and Johnson v. Ward, et al., No. 20-cv-00621-LTB, ECF No. 7 (D. Colo. Mar. 6, 2020). IFP on appeal is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(f)(2)(A) Plaintiff shall pay to the Clerk of the Court a monetary sanction of $400 to cover the cost and expenses of this action. FURTHER ORDERED that all pending motions are denied as moot. By Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 04/23/2020. (rvill, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
April 16, 2020 Filing 5 Case transferred in from District of Arkansas Eastern; Case Number 4:20-cv-00399. File, transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER immediately transferring this case to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Thomas Ray on 4/16/2020. (kdr) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT re #2 Complaint by Jabari J Johnson. (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Jabari J Johnson. (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/16/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jabari J Johnson. (ljb) [Transferred from Arkansas Eastern on 4/16/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Werts et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Werts
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brubaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jabari J. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?