Cillessen Trust, The et al v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Gunnison, Colorado et al
Plaintiff: Joyce K. Cillessen, James A. Cillessen and Cillessen Trust, The
Defendant: Joni Reynolds and Board of County Commissioners of the County of Gunnison, Colorado
Case Number: 1:2020cv01159
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 5, 2020 Filing 19 Civil Case Terminated pursuant #18 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i) by Plaintiffs James A. Cillessen, Joyce K. Cillessen, Cillessen Trust, The (Wells, Theodore)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 6/16/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 6/30/2020 at 2:30 PM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. By Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 05/18/2020. (rvill, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading re #1 Complaint,,,, #15 Amended Complaint,, by Plaintiffs James A. Cillessen, Joyce K. Cillessen, Cillessen Trust, The (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, Redlined Complaint)(Wells, Theodore)
May 8, 2020 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Board of County Commissioners of the County of Gunnison, Colorado, Joni Reynolds, filed by Cillessen Trust, The, Joyce K. Cillessen, James A. Cillessen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpt from Trust Agreement, #2 Exhibit B, Property Deed, #3 Exhibit C, First Public Health Order, #4 Exhibit D, Second Public Health Order, #5 Exhibit E, Fifth Public Health Order, #6 Exhibit F, Sixth Public Health Order, #7 Exhibit G, Seventh Public Health Order, #8 Exhibit H, Mailing from County from Early April, 2020, #9 Exhibit I, Email Denying Non-Resident Request, #10 Exhibit J, Eighth Public Health Order)(Wells, Theodore)
May 6, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Cillessen Trust, The, Joyce K. Cillessen, James A. Cillessen. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Gunnison, Colorado waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020; Joni Reynolds waiver sent on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. (Wells, Theodore)
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jonathan N. Eddy on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of the County of Gunnison, Colorado, Joni ReynoldsAttorney Jonathan N. Eddy added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Gunnison, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Jonathan N. Eddy added to party Joni Reynolds(pty:dft) (Eddy, Jonathan)
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Eric Michael Ziporin on behalf of Board of County Commissioners of the County of Gunnison, Colorado, Joni ReynoldsAttorney Eric Michael Ziporin added to party Board of County Commissioners of the County of Gunnison, Colorado(pty:dft), Attorney Eric Michael Ziporin added to party Joni Reynolds(pty:dft) (Ziporin, Eric)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Patrick Curry on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Michael Patrick Curry added to party James A. Cillessen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Patrick Curry added to party Joyce K. Cillessen(pty:pla), Attorney Michael Patrick Curry added to party Cillessen Trust, The(pty:pla) (Curry, Michael)
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Theodore Allen Wells on behalf of James A. Cillessen, Joyce K. Cillessen, Cillessen Trust, TheAttorney Theodore Allen Wells added to party James A. Cillessen(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Allen Wells added to party Joyce K. Cillessen(pty:pla), Attorney Theodore Allen Wells added to party Cillessen Trust, The(pty:pla) (Wells, Theodore)
April 27, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (angar, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1159-NRN (angar, )
April 27, 2020 Filing 7 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE re #1 Complaint,,,, Filing of Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs James A. Cillessen, Joyce K. Cillessen, Cillessen Trust, The (Labe, L.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Joni Reynolds in her official capacity as Public Health Director of Gunnison County re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiffs James A Cillessen, Joyce K Cillessen, The Cillessen Trust. (Labe, L.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County re #1 Complaint,,,, by Plaintiffs James A Cillessen, Joyce K Cillessen, The Cillessen Trust. (Labe, L.)
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Board of County Commissioners of Gunnison County, The, Joni Reynolds as Gunnison County Public Health Director (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7266944)Attorney L. Jay Labe added to party James A Cillessen(pty:pla), Attorney L. Jay Labe added to party Joyce K Cillessen(pty:pla), Attorney L. Jay Labe added to party The Cillessen Trust(pty:pla), filed by The Cillessen Trust, Joyce K Cillessen, James A Cillessen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Excerpts of Trust Agreement, #2 Exhibit B, Property Deed, #3 Exhibit C, March 13, 2020, First Public Health Order, #4 Exhibit D, March 16, 2020, Second Public Health Order, #5 Exhibit E, April 3, 2020, Fifth Public Health Order, #6 Exhibit F, April 11, 2020, Sixth Public Health Order, #7 Exhibit G, April 21, 2020, Seventh Public Health Order, #8 Exhibit H, April, 2020 Mailing from Gunnison County Government, #9 Exhibit I, April 18, 2020 E-Mail Denying Request for Non-Resident Exemption)(Labe, L.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cillessen Trust, The et al v. Board of County Commissioners of the County of Gunnison, Colorado et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce K. Cillessen
Represented By: L. Jay Labe
Represented By: Michael Patrick Curry
Represented By: Theodore Allen Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James A. Cillessen
Represented By: L. Jay Labe
Represented By: Michael Patrick Curry
Represented By: Theodore Allen Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cillessen Trust, The
Represented By: L. Jay Labe
Represented By: Michael Patrick Curry
Represented By: Theodore Allen Wells
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joni Reynolds
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Jonathan N. Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of County Commissioners of the County of Gunnison, Colorado
Represented By: Eric Michael Ziporin
Represented By: Jonathan N. Eddy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?