Swirlate IP LLC v. Badger Meter, Inc.
Plaintiff: Swirlate IP LLC
Defendant: Badger Meter, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01165
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 6/18/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #11 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01165-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Motion to Continue. For good cause shown, the Motion is GRANTED. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that the Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference is RESET for a Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/20/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due 7/13/2020 by ECF filing and in word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov. Dial in information for the Scheduling Conference is as follows:CONFERENCE CALL LINE: (888) 251-2909ACCESS CODE: 5662814# SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/17/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
June 17, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Thomas Griggs on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Michael Thomas Griggs added to party Badger Meter, Inc.(pty:dft) (Griggs, Michael)
June 17, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Continue the Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Swirlate IP LLC. (Bennett, David)
June 17, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Swirlate IP LLC All parties do not consent.. (Bennett, David)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. The Court notes that the Motion for Extension of Time was filed after the deadline for which Defendant seeks an extension. Therefore, Defendant must show excusable neglect for failing to request an extension prior to its 5/20/2020 answer deadline. The Motion lacks any attempt to show excusable neglect. The fact that Plaintiff does not oppose the relief does not satisfy Defendant's burden in this regard; however, it does suggest that Plaintiff does not intend to seek default judgment. With this in mind, and taking into consideration Rule 1 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the Court GRANTS the Motion. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant shall have until 6/30/2020 to file its answer or otherwise responsive pleading. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 6/9/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
June 9, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Badger Meter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Reed, William)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Joseph John Bronesky on behalf of Badger Meter, Inc.Attorney Joseph John Bronesky added to party Badger Meter, Inc.(pty:dft) (Bronesky, Joseph)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by William R. Reed on behalf of Badger Meter, Inc.Attorney William R. Reed added to party Badger Meter, Inc.(pty:dft) (Reed, William)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 7/14/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 7/7/2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form (ECF. #[4-1]) is due 7/7/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 5/18/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Swirlate IP LLC. Badger Meter, Inc. served on 4/29/2020, answer due 5/20/2020. (Bennett, David)
April 24, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
April 24, 2020 Filing 2 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (cmadr, ) Modified to correct filing date on 4/27/2020 (cmadr, ).
April 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Badger Meter, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7267359)Attorney David R. Bennett added to party Swirlate IP LLC(pty:pla), filed by Swirlate IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - U.S. Patent No. 7,154,961, #2 Exhibit B - U.S. Patent No. 7,567,622, #3 Exhibit C - Resp to Office Action Appl. No. 11/633,421 (U.S. Patent No. 7,567,622), #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Summons)(Bennett, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swirlate IP LLC v. Badger Meter, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Swirlate IP LLC
Represented By: David R. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Badger Meter, Inc.
Represented By: Michael Thomas Griggs
Represented By: Joseph John Bronesky
Represented By: William R. Reed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?