Roberts v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Charlotte Roberts
Defendant: Sungard Availability Services Health & Welfare Plans, Aetna Life Insurance Company and Sungard Availability Services, LP
Case Number: 1:2020cv01233
Filed: May 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Roberts. Sungard Availability Services Health & Welfare Plans served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. (McDermott, Shawn)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 06/26/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/16/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/23/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Magistrate Judge Mix is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/26/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/26/20 re: #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Aetna Life Insurance Company. At least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #9 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01233-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Aetna Life Insurance Company All parties do not consent.. (Englert, Jack)
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jack M. Englert, Jr added to party Aetna Life Insurance Company(pty:dft) by Aetna Life Insurance Company.(Englert, Jack)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Charlotte Roberts. Sungard Availability Services, LP served on 6/19/2020, answer due 7/10/2020. (McDermott, Shawn)
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Charlotte Roberts. Aetna Life Insurance Company waiver sent on 6/16/2020, answer due 8/17/2020. (McDermott, Shawn)
May 4, 2020 Filing 5 ADVISORY NOTICE TO COUNSEL AND COURT: Thomas Daniel Grant attempted to enter an appearance in this case by affixing his "s/" signature to the complaint. Counsel was removed from the attorney roll on or after January 31, 2019, for failing to pay the 2018 Biennial fee. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a)(5), his purported appearance will not be recognized. Counsel must complete a Bar/ECF application through counsel's Attorney Services Portal account and pay the full application fee to be restored to the attorney roll and CM/ECF. Additionally, counsel must file a notice of entry of appearance in this case upon being restored to the attorney roll. (Text Only Entry) (mfred)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Shawn E. McDermott on behalf of Charlotte RobertsAttorney Shawn E. McDermott added to party Charlotte Roberts(pty:pla) (McDermott, Shawn)
May 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aetna Life Insurance Company, Sungard Availability Services Health & Welfare Plans, Sungard Availability Services, LP (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7277802)Attorney Timothy M. Garvey added to party Charlotte Roberts(pty:pla), filed by Charlotte Roberts. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(Garvey, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberts v. Aetna Life Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sungard Availability Services Health & Welfare Plans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aetna Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sungard Availability Services, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlotte Roberts
Represented By: Shawn E. McDermott
Represented By: Timothy M. Garvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?