Crow v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Bradley Crow
Defendant: Angle Julmy, Quarles Leto, Michelle Berry and Colorado Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2020cv01242
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Prison Condition
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE of Service by Mail by Clerk of Court re #16 Minute Order to CASE MANAGER FOR Bradley Crow Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF) P.O. Box 6000 Sterling, CO 80751. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING SERVICE BY UNITED STATES MARSHAL by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 July 2020. ORDERED that, if appropriate, the Clerk shall attempt to obtain a waiver of service from the Defendants pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(d). If unable to do so, the United States Marshal shall serve a copy of the complaint, summons, order granting leave to proceed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915, and all other orders upon the Defendants. (cmadr, )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 2 July 2020. It is ORDERED that a Preliminary Scheduling/Status Conference will be held before this Court on September 9, 2020, at 10:30 a.m., in the Alfred A. Arraj U.S. Courthouse, Courtroom A-501, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. The Plaintiff shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling/Status Conference. The Plaintiff shall participate in this conference by telephone. Plaintiff and his case manager, or a representative of the facility, shall contact the Court at (303) 844-4507 on the above date and time in order to participate. In addition to notice of filing of this Minute Order being provided to the parties, it isORDERED that the office of the Clerk shall mail a copy of this Minute Order to the following: CASE MANAGER FOR Bradley Crow #183591 Sterling Correctional Facility (SCF) P.O. Box 6000 Sterling, CO 80751. (cmadr, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 15 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (evana, )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DRAWING CASE. After review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(b), the Court has determined that this case does not appear to be appropriate for summary dismissal. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty for all further proceedings, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/2/2020. All future filings should be designated as 20-cv-1242 MEH (evana, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Bradley Crow, Angle Julmy, Quarles Leto, filed by Bradley Crow.(evana, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER On May 6, 2020, the Court issued an Order Directing Plaintiff to file an amended Prisoner Complaint. (ECF No. #5 ). The amended pleading is currently due on July 31, 2020. (ECF No. #9 ). On June 24, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Letter (ECF No. #11 ) asking the clerk of the court to send him a copy of the court-approved Prisoner Complaint form because he is unable to obtain it from the facility's legal assistant due to closure of the prison law library. The request is GRANTED. The clerk of the court shall mail Plaintiff a copy of the court-approved Prisoner Complaint form. Mr. Crow is warned that failure to file an amended pleading by the deadline of July 31, 2020 may result in dismissal of some or all of this action without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/26/2020.(mailed as ordered)(evana, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Order to forward 3 packets of forms by Plaintiff Bradley Crow. (evana, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 STATEMENT of Claims re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Bradley Crow. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(evana, )
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER Granting in part #8 Letter requesting an additional 60-day extension of time to file his amended Prisoner Complaint in compliance with the Court's May 6, 2020 Order (ECF No. #5 ). Plaintiff shall file his amended Prisoner Complaint, in compliance with the May 6 Order, on or before July 31, 2020. No further extensions will be granted absent a showing of just cause. The fact that Mr. Crow has three civil rights suits pending in this Court will not be considered just cause for a further extension of time. Failure to comply by the deadline may result in dismissal of some or all of this action without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/5/2020.(evana, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for 60 day Extension of Time by Plaintiff Bradley Crow. (evana, )
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER On May 20, 2020, Plaintiff filed a Letter (ECF No. #6 ), informing the Court that he wishes to modify his complaint to drop one of the named Defendants. On May 6, 2020, the Court issued an Order (ECF No. #5 ), directing Mr. Crow to file an amended Prisoner Complaint. Mr. Crow shall file an amended Prisoner Complaint on or before June 30, 2020. The amended Prisoner Complaint must include all claims for relief Mr. Crow intends to assert in this action and name the responsible Defendants. The Court will not accept piecemeal filings as amendments to the Prisoner Complaint, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/26/2020. (evana, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER by Plaintiff Bradley Crow. (athom, )
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED PRISONER COMPLAINT within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, an amended Prisoner Complaint as directed in this Order. that, if Mr. Crow fails to file an amended Prisoner Complaint within the time allowed, some or all of this action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/6/2020. (evana, )
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #2 ) is GRANTED. That, within 30 days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff's custodian shall disburse from Plaintiff's prison account, if funds are available in keeping with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b), an initial partial filing fee of $9.51 to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the District of Colorado, which represents 20 percent of the greater of the (1) average monthly deposits, or (2) average monthly balance in Plaintiff's prison accounts for the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of the Complaint. That the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this order to DOC_inmateaccounts@state.co.us. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/5/2020.(mailed as ordered)(evana, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Bradley Crow. (trvo, )
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 Prisoner COMPLAINT against Michelle Berry, Colorado Department of Corrections, Angle Julmy, Quarles Leto, filed by Bradley Crow.(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crow v. Colorado Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Angle Julmy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quarles Leto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle Berry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley Crow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?