Singleton v. Williams et al
Petitioner: Karl Heinz Singleton
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The and Dean Williams
Case Number: 1:2020cv01286
Filed: May 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that Applicant cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. If Applicant fails to cure all designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Amend Respondant's (ECF No. #6 ) is denied as moot, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/19/2020.(apesa, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #6 MOTION for Order to Addressed to Karl Heinz Singleton. (apesa, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #4 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus Addressed to Karl Heinz Singleton. (apesa, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Amend Respondant's, by Petitioner Karl Heinz Singleton. (apesa, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action, by Petitioner Karl Heinz Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(apesa, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 4 Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Karl Heinz Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(apesa, )
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Directing Petition to Cure Deficiencies. If Petitioner fails to cure all designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/11/2020. (rvill, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 6, 2020 Filing 1 Petition Under 28 USC 2254 for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody, filed by Karl Heinz Singleton. (Attachments: #1 Resident Account Summary)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Singleton v. Williams et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Karl Heinz Singleton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?