Medina v. Williams
Petitioner: Delano Medina
Respondent: Dean Williams
Case Number: 1:2020cv01307
Filed: May 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 26, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Filing 8 USCA Case Number 20-1193 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Delano Medina. (angar, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 7 USCA Case Number 20-1193 for #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Delano Medina. (apesa, )
May 26, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the #5 Notice of Appeal filed by Delano Medina to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (Pro Se, Fee not paid and 1915 motion not filed,) (Attachments: #1 Preliminary Record, #2 Docket Sheet)(apesa, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #3 Order Dismissing Case, by Petitioner Delano Medina. (apesa, )
May 12, 2020 Filing 4 JUDGMENT re: #3 Order of Dismissal on 5/12/2020. (angar, )
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER of Dismissal. Leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of a motion seeking leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal in the United States Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 5/12/2020. forms mailed as ordered (angar, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 8, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241 (Filing fee $5, Receipt Number: COX095035), filed by Delano Medina. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medina v. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Delano Medina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dean Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?