In re: Jerome W. Kiggundu
Interested Party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado and U.S. Trustee
Appellant: Jerome W. Kiggundu
Appellee: No Appellee Named
Case Number: 1:2020cv01368
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #11 Minute Order, #9 Notice (Other), #10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 Addressed to Jerome W. Kiggundu. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (angar, )
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER. Mr. Kiggundu will be given one more opportunity to cure the remaining deficiency and must do so on or before July 17, 2020, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/17/2020. forms mailed as ordered (angar, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Under 28 U.S.C. 1915 by Appellant Jerome W. Kiggundu. (angar, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE re: Notice of Appeal by Appellant Jerome W. Kiggundu (angar, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Regarding Record on Appeal from United States Bankruptcy Court filed on 6/1/2020 (angar, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Daniel James Morse on behalf of U.S. TrusteeAttorney Daniel James Morse added to party U.S. Trustee(pty:ip) (Morse, Daniel)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Directing Appellant to Cure Deficiency. If Appellant fails to cure the designated deficiency within thirty days from the date of this order the notice of appeal and the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/14/2020. (angar, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 CASE OPENING. The above captioned case was opened on 05/13/2020 and assigned the case number referenced above. After docketing of the record on appeal from the U.S. Bankruptcy Court, briefing will proceed in accordance with Bankruptcy Rules 8014, 8015, and 8018, and any orders of the court. When referencing trial exhibits you must attach copies to your brief. If the court finds it necessary to have the originals presented it will issue an order. All filings with the United States District Court, unless otherwise permitted by our Electronic Case Filing Procedures, must be done electronically. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 Notice of Transmittal of Appeal Pursuant to Rule 8003(d) re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(trvo, )
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Dismissing Chapter 11 Case re: #1 Bankruptcy Appeal by United States Bankruptcy Court Judge Thomas B. McNamara on 04/28/2020. (trvo, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT by Appellant Jerome W. Kiggundu in re: Order Dismissing Chapter 11 Case of 04/28/2020. (trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In re: Jerome W. Kiggundu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: United States Bankruptcy Court for the District of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: U.S. Trustee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Jerome W. Kiggundu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: No Appellee Named
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?