Black v. People of the State of Colorado, The et al
Petitioner: Nathan David Black
Respondent: Laura A. Tighe and People of the State of Colorado, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv01369
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Petitioner Nathan David Black (angar, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE by Petitioner Nathan David Black (angar, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 14 CLERK'S NOTE REGARDING DEFAULT Default will not be entered as to People of the State of Colorado, The, Laura A. Tighe re #12 MOTION for Entry of Default as to as: the affidavit or declaration required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) does not include the date service was complete, the affidavit or declaration required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 55(a) does not include a statement that no responsive pleading has been filed within the time limit set by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or the court, the affidavit or declaration concerning defendant(s) military status required by Service Members Civil Relief Act was not filed, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (angar, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Discovery, by Petitioner Nathan David Black. (angar, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Default Judgment, by Petitioner Nathan David Black. (angar, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Entry of Default, by Petitioner Nathan David Black. (angar, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/24/2020. (angar, )
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER of Reference to United States Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 6/23/2020. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1369-LTB-GPG (angar, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1, the Clerk of Court is directed to assign this matter to Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. The undersigned will remain as the assigned magistrate judge, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/18/2020. (angar, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Civil Representation/Counsel by Petitioner Nathan David Black. (evana, )
June 9, 2020 Filing 7 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #4 by Petitioner Nathan David Black. (evana, )
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 LETTER by Petitioner Nathan David Black. (angar, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO #4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Petitioner Nathan David Black. (sphil, )
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to Show Cause. If Applicant fails to show good cause within the time allowed, the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/15/2020. (angar, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Petitioner Nathan David Black. (alave, )
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Nathan David Black.(alave, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. People of the State of Colorado, The et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Laura A. Tighe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of the State of Colorado, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nathan David Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?