Royal Crest Dairy, Inc. v. Continental Western Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01433
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Office: Denver Office
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 05:8705 - Declaratory Judgment - Insurance
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE of Request for Entry of Appearance of Attorney Christopher J. Maranges Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 45(f) by Movant George Wilton Keys (Carrington, Christopher)
May 20, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Patrick Carrington on behalf of George Wilton KeysAttorney Christopher Patrick Carrington added to party George Wilton Keys(pty:mov) (Carrington, Christopher)
May 20, 2020 Filing 30 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 29 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 28 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
May 20, 2020 Filing 27 Case transferred in from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:20-cv-00220. File, transfer order and docket sheet received
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDERED: Defendant Continental Western Insurance Company's Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado (Doc. #5 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to transfer Keys' motion (Doc. #1 ) to the United States District Court of Colorado for consideration in pending case Royal Crest Dairy, Inc. v. Continental Western Insurance Company, 1:17-cv-949-RM-KLM. Upon transfer, the Clerk is DIRECTED to terminate all deadlines, transfer any pending motions, and close the Fort Myers file.. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 5/19/2020. (AEH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
May 14, 2020 *** Attorney Tamara Chen-See terminated, pursuant to 19 . Co-Counsel has been notified. (SPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
May 14, 2020 *** Attorney Elayna M. Fiene terminated. (For failure to comply with 20 . Co-counsel notified by email.) (SPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
May 14, 2020 ***Staff notes. Attorney Colleen A. Maranges scheduled to be sworn into the Middle District of Florida on 5/21/20. (SPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
May 1, 2020 Filing 25 DEFENDANT'S BRIEF re #22 Response Reply filed by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Dudek, Kyle) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 22, 2020 ***COPIES mailed to Counsel: Elayna M. Fiene, Colleen A. Maranges, Tamara Chen-See; Unrepresented Parties: on behalf of Continental Western Insurance Company, George W. Keys, Royal Crest Dairy, Inc.; re 24 Order on Motion for Leave to File Document (RMT) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ENDORSED ORDER granting #23 Defendant Continental Western Insurance Company's Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of its Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Defendant may file a reply, not to exceed five pages, by May 1, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/21/2020. (HAP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 21, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION for Leave to File Other Document :Reply in Support of its Motion to Transfer to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado by Continental Western Insurance Company. (Dudek, Kyle) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 22 RESPONSE re #1 MOTION for Protective Order filed by George W. Keys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Knipe, Asher) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 13, 2020 ***COPIES mailed to Counsel: Elayna M. Fiene, Colleen A. Maranges, Tamara Chen-See; re 21 Notice to counsel of Local Rule, 20 Notice to counsel of Local Rule, 19 Notice to counsel of Local Rule (SPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE to counsel Colleen A. Maranges of Local Rule 2.01, General Admission to Practice, which states - No person shall be permitted to appear or be heard as counsel for another in any proceeding in this Court unless first admitted to practice in the Court pursuant to this rule (or heretofore admitted under prior rules of the Court). Apply for membership to the bar of this Court at www.flmd.uscourts.gov The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE to counsel Elayna M. Fiene of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE to counsel Tamara Chen-See of Local Rule 2.02, Special Admission to Practice - Non-resident attorney shall file a written designation and consent-to-act on the part of some member of the bar of this Court; Pay the $150.00 Special Admission Fee; Complete the E-Filer Registration Form to obtain a login and password for CM/ECF; Local counsel must electronically file a Motion to appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of the non-resident attorney The attorney listed shall file a notice of compliance within fourteen days. Failure to comply with this notice within fourteen days will result in counsel being terminated from the docket sheet without further notice. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (SPB) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Filing 18 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case filed by George W. Keys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Knipe, Asher) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 3, 2020 ***COPIES mailed to Counsel: Linda J. Knight, Elayna M. Fiene, Colleen A. Maranges, Tamara Chen-See re 17 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ENDORSED ORDER granting #16 Non-Party George W. Keys' Motion for Leave to File a Reply in Support of His Motion to Terminate or Limit the Scope of Deposition and for Protective Order. Non-Party Keys may file a reply, not to exceed four pages, by April 13, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/3/2020. (HAP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 3, 2020 *** Motion(s) REFERRED: #16 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Terminate or Limit the Scope of Deposition and for Protective Order [ECF No. 1]. Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. (CMC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief in support of #1 Motion to terminate or limit the scope of deposition and for protective order by George W. Keys. (Maranges, Christopher) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE Disclosure Statement re #11 Track Two Notice and corporate disclosure Order by Continential Western Insurance Company. (Corso, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 2, 2020 ***COPIES mailed to Counsel: Linda J. Knight, Elayna M. Fiene, Colleen J. Maranges; and Tamara Chen-See re 14 Notice canceling hearing, 13 Order no pdf (MLS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE canceling Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing scheduled for 5/14/2020 (WRW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ENDORSED ORDER VACATING #11 Track Two Notice and 12 Notice of Hearing setting a Preliminary Pretrial Conference and requiring the parties to file a Case Management Report. These documents were entered in this case inadvertently. However, all corporate parties must comply with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 immediately. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 4/1/2020. (brh) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 1, 2020 ***COPIES mailed to Counsel: Linda J. Knight, Elayna M. Fiene, Terence N. Ridley, Christopher J. Maranges, Tamara Chen-See; re 12 Notice of hearing (WRW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. All parties may appear telephonically. The toll-free teleconference number is 1-877-873-8018. The access code is 5997085. You will then be prompted to enter a participant security code: 20220. Parties are encouraged to utilize a landline or similarly stable connection free of ambient interference to avoid having any portion of the conference conducted without them. Parties shall file a Case Management Report on or before 5/7/2020.(WRW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 31, 2020 ***COPIES mailed to Counsel: Linda J. Knight, Elayna M. Fiene, Terence N. Ridley, Christopher J. Maranges, Tamara Chen-See; re #11 Related case order and track 2 notice (WRW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 31, 2020 Filing 11 TRACK TWO NOTICE AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE ORDER Signed by All Divisional Judges on 3/31/2020. (WRW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 31, 2020 ***COPIES mailed to Counsel: Linda J. Knight, Elayna M. Fiene, Terence N. Ridley, Colleen A. Maranges, Tamara Chen-See; re #10 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice (MLS) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #8 and #9 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice & Written Designations for Consent to Act. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/30/2020. (HAP) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Terence M. Ridley to appear pro hac vice by Continential Western Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Corso, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Linda J. Knight to appear pro hac vice by Continential Western Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Corso, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 30, 2020 ***COPIES mailed to Counsel: Linda J. Knight, Elayna M. Fiene, Terence N. Ridley, Christopher J. Maranges, Tamara Chen-See re 7 Miscellaneous Case transferred to civil docket, 6 Order (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 7 MISCELLANEOUS CASE 2:20-mc-1-FtM-38NPM transferred to civil docket. All further proceedings are to be docketed in civil case number 2:20-cv-220-FtM-38NPM. (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ENDORSED ORDER. The Clerk is DIRECTED to convert this case to a civil case and directly assign it to the undersigned and Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 3/27/2020. (NMC) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case by Continential Western Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G)(Dudek, Kyle) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 26, 2020 Filing 4 RESPONSE to Motion re #1 MOTION for Protective Order filed by Continential Western Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M)(Dudek, Kyle) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 25, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Terence M. Ridley, appearing on behalf of Continential Western Insurance Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014515.). (laf) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 25, 2020 ***PRO HAC VICE FEES paid by attorney Linda J. Knight, appearing on behalf of Continential Western Insurance Company (Filing fee $150 receipt number FTM014516.). (laf) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 17, 2020 ***COPIES mailed to Counsel: Linda J. Knight, Elayna M. Fiene, Terence N. Ridley, Christopher J. Maranges, Tamara Chen-See re 3 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ENDORSED ORDER granting #2 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time. By March 26, 2020, Defendant may file a response to the Motion to Terminate or Limit the Scope of Deposition. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell on 3/16/2020. (brh) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 13, 2020 ***Attorney Kyle Dudek,Elayna M. Fiene for Continential Western Insurance Company added per #2 . (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #1 MOTION for Protective Order by Continential Western Insurance Company. (Corso, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 3, 2020 FEES paid by George W. Keys (Filing fee $47.00 receipt number FtM014452) (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 3, 2020 ***Attorney Linda J. Knight for Continential Western Insurance Company added per #1 . (drn) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to terminate or limit the scope of deposition and for protective order and incorporated memorandum of law by George W. Keys. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (1 of 4), #2 Exhibit A (2 of 4), #3 Exhibit A (3 of 4), #4 Exhibit A (4 of 4), #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Exhibit F, #10 Exhibit G)(RMT) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Nicholas P. Mizell. Modified on 3/3/2020 to edit docket text (drn). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 5/20/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Royal Crest Dairy, Inc. v. Continental Western Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?