Parker v. U.S. Bank National Association
Plaintiff: Lisa Parker
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2020cv01471
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/30/2020. (bwilk, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 21 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 6/30/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 2/28/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/30/2021. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/26/2021 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: NYW-CRD. (bwilk, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order Writable copy filed timely on 06/23/20. Through error on Plaintiff's counsel PDF copy not filrd at the same time. by Plaintiff Lisa Parker. (Culkin, Francis)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 6/18/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
June 18, 2020 Filing 18 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #17 Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01471-CMA. (Text Only Entry). (sphil, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 6/18/2020. ORDERED that the clerk's office shall reassign this case by random draw. (sphil, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-1471-PAB (angar, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01471-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
June 16, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association All parties do not consent.. (Barnes, Aurora)
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent U.S. Bancorp, Other Affiliate Berkshire Hathaway Inc. for U.S. Bank National Association. (Barnes, Aurora)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NONCONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/1/2020. A Scheduling Conference is set for 6/30/2020 11:30 AM via telephone conference. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976. The Proposed Scheduling Order is due 6/23/2020. The parties shall complete and file the Consent/Nonconsent Form by 6/16/2020. (bwilk, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #10 Answer to Complaint filed by attorney Aurora Barnes. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures. Address, phone and fax numbers and e-mail address are missing. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant U.S. Bank N.A.'s ANSWER to #4 Complaint by U.S. Bank National Association.(Barnes, Aurora)
May 26, 2020 Filing 9 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (alave, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 6 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (alave, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Civil Summons and Civil Complaint and Jury Demand upon U.S. Bank National Association on 05/05/2020. (alave, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against U.S. Bank National Association, filed by Lisa Parker.(alave, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of FILING OF STATE COURT RECORDS by Defendant U.S. Bank National Association (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet, #2 Complaint and Jury Demand, #3 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #4 Delay Reduction Order)(Barnes, Aurora)
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael D. Plachy on behalf of U.S. Bank National AssociationAttorney Michael D. Plachy added to party U.S. Bank National Association(pty:dft) (Plachy, Michael)
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by U.S. Bank National Association from Denver District Court, Case Number 20cv31509. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7307830), filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Return of Service, #3 Exhibit C - Summons, #4 Exhibit D - State Court Notice of Filing, #5 Exhibit E - State Civil Case Cover, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Barnes, Aurora)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Parker v. U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Michael D. Plachy
Represented By: Aurora Temple Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Parker
Represented By: Francis K. Culkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?