Schroeder v. Carter
Petitioner: Mathew R. Schroeder
Respondent: Carter
Case Number: 1:2020cv01490
Filed: May 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #8 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #10 Order to File Preliminary Response for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (trvo, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 07/09/2020. Applicant's unsigned "Motion for Summary Default Judgement" (ECF No. #9 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. (athom, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO FILE PRELIMINARY RESPONSE. Within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order Respondent shall file a Preliminary Response that complies with this Order. Within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of the Preliminary Response Applicant may file a Reply, if he desires. If Respondent does not intend to raise the affirmative defense of exhaustion of administrative remedies, Respondent must notify the Court of that decision in the Preliminary Response. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 07/09/2020. (athom, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 Email. (athom, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Mathew R. Schroeder. (Attachments: #1 Letter) (athom, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 7 LETTER re: #5 Order Directing Applicant to Cure Deficiencies and to File an Amended Application, by Petitioner Mathew R. Schroeder. (athom, )
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number COX095268 (alave, )
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCIES AND TO FILE AN AMENDED APPLICATION. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies and file an Amended Application within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. The Motion at ECF No. #2 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as on the incorrect form. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Applicant, with a copy of this Order, one blank copy each of the Application for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action forms and applicable instructions. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 05/27/2020. (athom, ) (forms mailed as ordered)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to #1 Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Petitioner Mathew R. Schroeder. (rvill, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Order to Delay Filing Fee / To Proceed with Promise of Payment by Petitioner Mathew R. Schroeder. (Attachments: #1 Letter)(alave, )
May 22, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Mathew R. Schroeder. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Exhibit)(alave, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Schroeder v. Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Mathew R. Schroeder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?