Zyrcuits IP LLC v. Hitron Technologies Americas Inc.
Plaintiff: Zyrcuits IP LLC
Defendant: Hitron Technologies Americas Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01500
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2020 Civil Case Terminated pursuant to #9 on 1 July 2020. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Case by Plaintiff Zyrcuits IP LLC (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Rabicoff, Isaac)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to the Complaint by Defendant Hitron Technologies Americas Inc.. Hitron Technologies Americas Inc. answer due 7/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tsai, David)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 5/28/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Non-Consent Form. Consent Form due by 7/14/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/17/2020. Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 7/28/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 Report re Patent/Trademark: Report on the filing of an action emailed (NEF) to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (alave, )
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE Appearance by Plaintiff Zyrcuits IP LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Patent Infringement against Zyrcuits IP LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7311304)Attorney Isaac Philip Rabicoff added to party Zyrcuits IP LLC(pty:pla), filed by Zyrcuits IP LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons)(Rabicoff, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zyrcuits IP LLC v. Hitron Technologies Americas Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zyrcuits IP LLC
Represented By: Isaac Philip Rabicoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hitron Technologies Americas Inc.
Represented By: David Jeanchung Tsai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?