Foo v. Grismer, et al
Defendant: Denver District Attorney Office, Susan Lozow, Stephanie Grismer, Stephanie (I) Grismer and Susan (I) Lozow
Petitioner: Rickford Foo
Respondent: No Named Respondents
Case Number: 1:2020cv01532
Filed: May 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER The motion for extension of time (ECF No. #18 ) and motion to add defendants (ECF No. #14 ) are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature. Plaintiff filed a Prisoner Complaint on June 22, 2020 (ECF No. #11 ), which is the operative pleading. The Court will review the Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. #11 ) as required by D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(b) and 28 U.S.C. 1915 in due course, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/16/2020.(evana, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time by Petitioner Rickford Foo. (evana, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 17 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #14 MOTION for Order to Addressed to Rickford Foo. (apesa, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 16 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #12 Notice (Other), #10 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915., #11 Amended Complaint Addressed to Rickford Foo. (apesa, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 15 Mail Returned as Undeliverable re: #13 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis, Addressed to Rickford Foo. (apesa, )
June 24, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to add defendants by Petitioner Rickford Foo. (evana, )
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 (ECF No. #10 ) is GRANTED. That the Clerk of the Court shall send a copy of this Order to Denver County Jail, Business Office, Attention: Inmate Accounts, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/23/2020.(Mailed as Ordered)(evana, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of upcoming transfer by Petitioner Rickford Foo (evana, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Stephanie Grismer, Stephanie (I) Grismer, Susan Lozow, Susan (I) Lozow, Denver District Attorney Office, filed by Rickford Foo.(evana, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 10 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Petitioner Rickford Foo. (evana, )
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SECOND ORDER DIRECTING MR. FOO TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that he files in response to this order must be labeled with the civil action number identified on this order. That the 1915 Motions at ECF Nos. #6 and #7 are DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as on an incorrect form. That the motion regarding witnesses (ECF No. #8 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as premature. That the Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Mr. Foo, with a copy of this Order, one blank copy each of the current Court-approved Prisoner Complaint and Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 forms and applicable instructions, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/12/2020.(mailed as ordered)(evana, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Order to add witnesses to lawsuit by Petitioner Rickford Foo. (evana, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION an Affidavit for Leave to proceed on Appeal by Petitioner Rickford Foo. (evana, )
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Petitioner Rickford Foo. (evana, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 5 SUPPLEMENT to #1 MOTION for Order to by Petitioner Rickford Foo. (evana, )
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 Letter from Rickford Foo (evana, )
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING MR. FOO TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Petitioner files in response to this order must be labeled with the civil action number identified on this order. That if Petitioner fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. That the Motion at ECF No. 1 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as on an incorrect form. by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 5/29/2020.(evana, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
May 28, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Reconsider/Overturn Due to Ineffective Assistance of Counsel (Habeas Corpus) by Petitioner Rickford Foo. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Letter)(trvo, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foo v. Grismer, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: No Named Respondents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Rickford Foo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver District Attorney Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Lozow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Grismer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie (I) Grismer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan (I) Lozow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?