IIT, Inc. et al v. Communications Distributors, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Abdi Abas and IIT, Inc.
Defendant: IDT Corporation, Robert Dieter and Communications Distributors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01580
Filed: June 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael P. Cross on behalf of Communications Distributors, LLC, Robert DieterAttorney Michael P. Cross added to party Communications Distributors, LLC (pty:dft), Attorney Michael P. Cross added to party Robert Dieter(pty:dft) (Cross, Michael)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER In light of 14 Clerk's Entry of Default, the Clerk of Court is direct to reassign this matter to a District Judge. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(3). The Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2020 09:45 AM, and related deadlines, are VACATED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/30/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Communications Distributors, LLC re #13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Communication Distributors, LLC, by Clerk. Text Only Entry (jgonz, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Entry of Default as to Defendant, Communication Distributors, LLC by Plaintiffs Abdi Abas, IIT, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of T. Edward Williams, Esq. in Support of Motion for Entry of Clerk's Default)(Williams, T.)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Carwinski, Timothy)
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant IDT Corporation. (Carwinski, Timothy)
July 22, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Stipulation Between Plaintiffs and Defendant, IDT Corporation re: Filing an Answer or Responsive Pleading by Plaintiffs Abdi Abas, IIT, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A: Williams-Colman Email)(Williams, T.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. IDT Corporation served on 6/4/2020, answer due 6/25/2020. (Williams, T.)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by All Plaintiffs. Communications Distributors, LLC served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. (Williams, T.)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 ERRATA re #2 Notice (Other), #1 Complaint by Plaintiff Abdi Abas. (Williams, T.)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 8/5/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/12/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/3/2020. (jgonz, )
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (cmadr, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (cmadr, )
June 2, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Robert Mitchell Dieter, IDT Corporation, Communications Distributors, LLC by Plaintiff Abdi Abas. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons, #2 Summons Summons)(Williams, T.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiffs Abdi Abas, IIT, Inc. (Williams, T.)
June 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7321222)Attorney T. Edward Williams added to party Abdi Abas(pty:pla), filed by Abdi Abas.(Williams, T.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: IIT, Inc. et al v. Communications Distributors, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IDT Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Dieter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Communications Distributors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abdi Abas
Represented By: T. Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IIT, Inc.
Represented By: T. Edward Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?