Barton v. Red Rock Auto Group, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jason Barton
Defendant: Red Rock Auto Group, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01627
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 47:0227
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER Pursuant to #11 Notice of Settlement, the parties shall file Dismissal Papers or a report regarding the status of settlement on or before 8/31/2020. The Scheduling Conference set for 8/19/2020 10:00 AM, and related deadlines, are VACATED. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 7/31/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Settlement by Defendant Red Rock Auto Group, Inc. (Thornton, J.)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of the Deadline for Defendant to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint until 7/31/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/26/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Red Rock Auto Group, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Thornton, J.)
June 26, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Matt Thornton on behalf of Red Rock Auto Group, Inc.Attorney J. Matt Thornton added to party Red Rock Auto Group, Inc.(pty:dft) (Thornton, J.)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jason Barton. Red Rock Auto Group, Inc. served on 6/10/2020, answer due 7/1/2020. (Eisenband, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Ignacio Javier Hiraldo on behalf of Jason BartonAttorney Ignacio Javier Hiraldo added to party Jason Barton(pty:pla) (Hiraldo, Ignacio)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/19/2020 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Consent Form due by 8/5/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 8/12/2020, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 6/8/2020. (jgonz, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (alave, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael Eisenband on behalf of Jason BartonAttorney Michael Eisenband added to party Jason Barton(pty:pla) (Eisenband, Michael)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Red Rock Auto Group, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7327262)Attorney Andrew John Shamis added to party Jason Barton(pty:pla), filed by Jason Barton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Shamis, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barton v. Red Rock Auto Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Barton
Represented By: Michael Eisenband
Represented By: Andrew John Shamis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Rock Auto Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?