Nesti v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Plaintiff: Windy Nesti
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Case Number: 1:2020cv01642
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Employee Retirement Income Security Act (ERISA)
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Windy Nesti. (Kern, Mary)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER re: 9 Case Reassigned. In light of the reassignment of this case to this Court the Scheduling Conference set 8/10/2020 before Magistrate Judge Tafoya is vacated. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic, this Court will not hold a scheduling conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order by 8/3/2020 pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/9/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #8 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01642-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Life Insurance Company of North America All parties do not consent.. (Englert, Jack)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Attorney Jack M. Englert, Jr added to party Life Insurance Company of North America(pty:dft) by Life Insurance Company of North America.(Englert, Jack)
June 16, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Windy Nesti. Life Insurance Company of North America served on 6/15/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. (Kern, Mary)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/10/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 8/3/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/9/2020. (ksena)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (trvo, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Counsel by Shawn E. McDermott on behalf of Windy NestiAttorney Shawn E. McDermott added to party Windy Nesti(pty:pla) (McDermott, Shawn)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Life Insurance Company of North America (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7328708)Attorney Mary Susan Kern added to party Windy Nesti(pty:pla), filed by Windy Nesti. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Kern, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nesti v. Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Life Insurance Company of North America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Windy Nesti
Represented By: Shawn E. McDermott
Represented By: Mary Susan Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?