Winiasz v. Freedman
Plaintiff: Susan Winiasz
Defendant: Michael Freedman
Case Number: 1:2020cv01736
Filed: June 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Nina Y Wang
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/22/20. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 5/13/2021. (nmarb, )
July 22, 2020 Filing 17 COURTROOM MINUTES/MINUTE ORDER for Scheduling Conference held on 7/22/2020 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Discovery due by 3/1/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2021. A Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/20/2021 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. The parties shall file their proposed pretrial order through CM/ECF and include a courtesy copy of the proposed order in Word format sent by email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the conference. FTR: NYW-CRD. (bwilk, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 16 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Susan Winiasz. (Ongert, Trenton)
July 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER striking #14 Plaintiff's F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 5(d)(1)(A) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.3, such documents are not to be filed on the courts docket. By Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/15/2020. Text Only Entry (nywlc1)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 STRICKEN NOTICE Plaintiff's F.R.C.P. 26(a)(1) Initial Disclosures by Plaintiff Susan Winiasz (Ongert, Trenton) Modified to show stricken pursuant to ecf 15 on 7/15/2020 (cthom, ).
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #12 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/7/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
July 7, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Susan Winiasz All parties consent.. (Ongert, Trenton)
June 18, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lelia Kathleen Chaney on behalf of Michael FreedmanAttorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party Michael Freedman(pty:dft) (Chaney, Lelia)
June 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 6/16/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 7/8/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 7/15/2020. Telephonic Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 7/22/2020 01:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Joseph D. Bloch by Trenton Jeffrey Ongert on behalf of Susan Winiasz (Ongert, Trenton)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance Trenton J. Ongert by Trenton Jeffrey Ongert on behalf of Susan WiniaszAttorney Trenton Jeffrey Ongert added to party Susan Winiasz(pty:pla) (Ongert, Trenton)
June 15, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint and Jury Demand by Michael Freedman.(Jordan, Lindsay)
June 15, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cmadr, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 4 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons & Complaint upon Michael Freedman on 27 May 2020 (cmadr, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Michael Freedman, filed by Susan Winiasz.(cmadr, )
June 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Michael Freedman from District Court, County of Eagle, Case Number 2020CV30073. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7340668), filed by Michael Freedman. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A-1, #2 Appendix A-2, #3 Appendix A-3, #4 Appendix A-4, #5 Appendix A-5, #6 Appendix A-6, #7 Appendix A-7, #8 Appendix A-8, #9 Appendix A-9, #10 Appendix A-10, #11 Appendix A-11, #12 Appendix A-12, #13 Appendix A-13, #14 Appendix A-14, #15 Appendix A-15, #16 Appendix A-16, #17 Appendix A-17, #18 Appendix A-18, #19 Civil Cover Sheet)(Jordan, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winiasz v. Freedman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Freedman
Represented By: Lindsay Michelle Jordan
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Winiasz
Represented By: Trenton Jeffrey Ongert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?