Cline v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Petitioner: Emily Cline
Respondent: Executive Director of CDOC and La Vista Correctional Facility
Case Number: 1:2020cv01796
Filed: June 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2020 Filing 11 ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE on behalf of Dean Williams and Richard Persons on 7/29/2020 (apesa, )
July 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/29/2020. On June 29, 2020, the Court issued an Order to File Preliminary Response (ECFNo. #8 ). The Order was not served until July 28, 2020. (See ECF No. #9 ). Accordingly, the Preliminary Response is due on or before August 18, 2020. Applicant has 21 days from the filing of the Preliminary Response to submit a Reply, if any. (apesa, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #5 Amended Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #8 Order to File Preliminary Response for Service of Process. (alave, )
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO FILE PRELIMINARY RESPONSE. ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order, Respondents shall file a Preliminary Response that complies with this Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of the Response, Applicant may file a Reply, if she desires. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Respondents do not intend to raise either of the affirmative defenses of timeliness or exhaustion of state court remedies, Respondents must notify the Court of that decision in the Preliminary Response, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/29/2020. (apesa, )
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING LEAVE TO PROCEED PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1915. ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action (ECF No. #6 ) is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 and Fed. R. App. P. 24 (ECF No. #2 ) is DENIED as improperly filed. FURTHER ORDERED that process shall not issue at this time, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/29/2020.(apesa, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 6 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Petitioner Emily Cline. (evana, )
June 22, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, filed by Emily Cline.(evana, )
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING APPLICANT TO CURE DEFICIENCY. ORDERED that Applicant cure the deficiency designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Applicant shall obtain a copy of the court-approved form for filing a Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 in a Habeas Corpus Action (with the assistance of her case manager or the facility's legal assistant) at www.cod.uscourts.gov and shall use the form in curing the deficiency. If Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencieswithin thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action may be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/18/2020. (apesa, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 2 Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed on Appeal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Petitioner Emily Cline. (cmadr, )
June 17, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Emily Cline.(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cline v. Executive Director of CDOC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Executive Director of CDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: La Vista Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Emily Cline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?