Yang v. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Hongwei Yang
Defendant: John Fabbricatore, Chad Wolf, Elizabeth McGrail and Johhny Choate
Case Number: 1:2020cv01806
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Raymond P Moore
Nature of Suit: Prisoner - Civil Rights (U.S. not a defendant)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2020 Filing 24 Exhibits in Support of #23 MOTION to Dismiss (Exhibit A) by Defendants Johhny Choate, John Fabbricatore, Chad Wolf. (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 14, 2020 Filing 23 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Johhny Choate, John Fabbricatore, Chad Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit B-Andrews Declaration)(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 14, 2020 Filing 22 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Elizabeth McGrail. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A-Burgus Declaration)(Hagerty, Elizabeth)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #20 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond. Defendant Johnny Choate shall file an answer or other responsive pleading on or before August 21, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 8/13/2020. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
August 13, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #9 Amended Complaint as to Fifth Claim for Relief by Defendant Johhny Choate. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Smith, Ann)
August 10, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Hongwei Yang. Plaintiff consents. (rvill, )
August 10, 2020 Filing 18 USPS Return Receipt re: #16 Amended Certificate of Service. (rvill, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 17 USPS Return Receipt re: #16 Amended Certificate of Service. (rvill, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 AMENDED CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #9 Prisoner Complaint, #13 Order Directing Service and Response for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt, #2 USPS Certified Mail Receipt, #3 USPS Certified Mail Receipt, #4 USPS Certified Mail Receipt, #5 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (trvo, )
July 24, 2020 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #9 Prisoner Complaint, #13 Order Directing Service and Response for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (trvo, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. Plaintiff's emergency motion (ECF No. #1 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on 07/24/2020. (rvill, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Directing Service and Response. The United States Marshals Service shall serve process on any defendants for whom personal service is required. It isFURTHER ORDERED that Defendants shall file an Answer or otherwise respond to the Prisoner Complaint (ECF No. #9 ) within twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on July 24, 2020. (rvill, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Defendants' Motion to Clarify #11 . The Court is directing a response to the Complaint #9 . The Court is aware of the Emergency Motion #1 and intends to address it shortly. The Court is not, however, in need of a response from the Defendants as to that Motion. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 7/24/2020. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec )
July 24, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Clarify Deadline by Defendants John Fabbricatore, Chad Wolf. (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #8 Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. By Judge Raymond P. Moore on July 23, 2020. (rvill, ) Modified to correct file date on 7/24/2020 (rvill, ).
July 21, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against John Fabbricatore, Chad Wolf, Johhny Choate, Elizabeth McGrail, filed by Hongwei Yang.(evana, )
July 21, 2020 Filing 8 Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. by Plaintiff Hongwei Yang. (evana, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Elizabeth Hagerty on behalf of All Defendants Attorney Elizabeth Hagerty added to party John Fabbricatore(pty:dft), Attorney Elizabeth Hagerty added to party Chad Wolf(pty:dft) (Hagerty, Elizabeth)
July 6, 2020 Filing 6 USPS Return Receipt re: #4 Certificate of Service.(rvill, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUPERSEDING ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES: If Plaintiff does not file an operative pleading by 7/22/2020, his motion will be construed as a petition for writ of habeas corpus under 28 U.S.C. 2241. This order supersedes the Court's 6/22/2020 order. Entered by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 6/26/2020. (cpear) Modified on 6/26/2020 to correct text (cpear).
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Service by Clerk of Court re #3 Order Directing Plaintiff to Cure Deficiencies and Drawing Case, and #1 Plaintiff's Emergency Motion for Release for Service of Process. (Attachments: #1 USPS Certified Mail Receipt) (trvo, )
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES AND DRAWING CASE. ORDERED that this case shall be drawn to a district judge and to a magistrate judge. Plaintiff shall cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order the action may be dismissed without further notice. The Clerk of Court is directed to mail to Plaintiff, with a copy of this Order, one blank copy each of the Prisoner Complaint and Prisoner's Motion and Affidavit for Leave to Proceed Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915 forms and instructions. Case randomly reassigned to Judge Raymond P. Moore for all further proceedings and drawn to Magistrate Judge Tafoya, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/22/2020. (apesa, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cmadr, )
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 Plaintiff's Emergency MOTION for Release by Plaintiff Hongwei Yang. (Attachments: #1 Letter from USCA)(cmadr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Fabbricatore
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Wolf
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Elizabeth McGrail
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johhny Choate
Represented By: Elizabeth Hagerty
Represented By: Ann Baumgartner Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hongwei Yang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?