Ruiz v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
Plaintiff: Ruby Ruiz
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv01872
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 STIPULATED 502(d) ORDER Entered by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/10/20. (nmarb, )
August 6, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION Stipulated Order Re: FRE 502 by Plaintiff Ruby Ruiz. (Crichton, Charles)
August 6, 2020 Filing 22 Proposed Scheduling Order Amended Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ruby Ruiz. (Crichton, Charles)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/3/20. KLM Civil Trial Practice Standards. Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 10/29/2021. (nmarb, )
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER entered by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/3/2020. (bwilk, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 19 COURTROOM MINUTES for Scheduling Conference held on 8/3/2020 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Plaintiff shall file a supplement regarding the computation of damages on or before 8/17/2020. A stipulated proposed 502(d) order shall be filed no later than 8/17/2020. Discovery due by 4/30/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/31/2021. A Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation/Jury Instruction Conference are set for 11/5/2021 01:30 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. A proposed Final Pretrial Order is due no later than seven (7) daysbefore the Final Pretrial Conference. A four-day Jury Trial is set on 1/31/2022 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. FTR: KLM-CRD. (Attachments: #1 Requirements of Practice) (bwilk, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/24/20. KLM Civil Motions Practice Standards. (nmarb, )
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER. In accordance with efforts to minimize the spread of COVID-19, all counsel or parties who wish to participate in, or members of the public who wish to listen into, the Scheduling Conference set on August 3, 2020 at 11:00 a.m. shall do so by TELEPHONE by calling the Court at 888-363-4749, Access Code: 2115325#, at the time of the hearing. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/24/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER OF REFERENCE. Pursuant to the consent of the parties to the jurisdiction of the magistrate judge #14 , this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all purposes pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/22/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
July 21, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Ruby Ruiz. (Crichton, Charles)
July 20, 2020 Filing 14 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Dollar Tree Stores, Inc All parties consent.. (Bryan, Christopher)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/3/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Scheduling Order due 7/27/2020, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/2/2020. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#9] is July 20, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/2/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to #7 Complaint by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc.(Bryan, Christopher)
June 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Charles Griffith Crichton on behalf of Ruby RuizAttorney Charles Griffith Crichton added to party Ruby Ruiz(pty:pla) (Crichton, Charles)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (trvo, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Complaint and Summons upon Dollar Tree Stores, Inc on 06/04/2020. (trvo, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Dollar Tree Stores, Inc, filed by Ruby Ruiz.(trvo, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (trvo, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alison Foley Burke on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc Attorney Alison Foley Burke added to party Dollar Tree Stores, Inc (pty:dft) (Burke, Alison)
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Daniel Bryan on behalf of Dollar Tree Stores, Inc Attorney Christopher Daniel Bryan added to party Dollar Tree Stores, Inc (pty:dft) (Bryan, Christopher)
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Dollar Tree, Inc. for Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Johnson, James)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc from Arapahoe County District Court, Case Number 2020cv31101. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7357069), filed by Dollar Tree Stores, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F)(Johnson, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ruiz v. Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruby Ruiz
Represented By: Charles Griffith Crichton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dollar Tree Stores, Inc
Represented By: James Ryan Johnson
Represented By: Christopher Daniel Bryan
Represented By: Alison Foley Burke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?