Dorn v. Avery et al
Plaintiff: Thomas James Dorn
Defendant: Lillian Avery and Meridith Avery
Case Number: 1:2020cv01883
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Thomas James Dorn All parties do not consent. (nmarb, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lillian Avery, Meridith Avery, filed by Thomas James Dorn.(evana, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Pro-se Representation by Plaintiff Thomas James Dorn (evana, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Amend #11 Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Thomas James Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial)(evana, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 11 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lillian Avery, Meridith Avery, filed by Thomas James Dorn.(evana, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to the Court, by Plaintiff Thomas James Dorn. (evana, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Plaintiff Thomas James Dorn (evana, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 Letter from Clerk of Court re: Service of Process re #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form, #4 Federal Rules of Civil Procedure Rule 4) (alave, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (apesa, )
July 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DRAWING CASE. Case randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher no longer assigned to case. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-1883-KLM, by Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/7/2020. (apesa, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Lillian Avery and Meredith Avery by Plaintiff Thomas James Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Summons Request, #2 Envelope)(trvo, )
July 6, 2020 Filing 4 Filing fee: $400, receipt number: COX095644. (trvo, )
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That, if Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 6/26/2020. (evana, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (alave, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lillian Avery, Meridith Avery, filed by Thomas James Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(alave, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorn v. Avery et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lillian Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridith Avery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas James Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?