Leventhal v. Roaring Fork Club, LLC
Plaintiff: Harry Leventhal
Defendant: Roaring Fork Club, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01886
Filed: June 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Philip A Brimmer
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 29:621
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Roaring Fork Club, LLC.(Kratz, Timothy)
July 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Scheduling Conference which had been set with Judge Neureiter is hereby VACATED and re-set for 10/7/2020 10:00 AM in Room 323 (Grand Junction) before Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Parties are to comply with the Instructions for Scheduling Order found on the USDC website for Magistrate Judge Gallagher. Also - due to Covid-19 and court rules, this Conference SHALL be telephonic with the parties calling in to 888-363-4749, Access Code 3136546#. By Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on July 20, 2020. Text Only Entry (gpgsec, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: This matter has its factual nexus in Pitkin County. According to the Court's Revised Jury Plan for Random Jury Selection, this case is therefore properly designated for Jury Division 3. Because the jury will be drawn from that Division, it is appropriate that the case be managed, for pretrial purposes, by Magistrate Judge Gallagher in Grand Junction. Accordingly, pursuant to D.C. Colo. L. Civ. R. 40.1(a), the undersigned directs that the Clerk of the Court reassign this action to Magistrate Judge Gallagher as the referral judge. All further pleadings in this case shall reflect the case number of 20-cv-1886-PAB-GPG. By Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/14/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kathleen A. O'Grady on behalf of Roaring Fork Club, LLCAttorney Kathleen A. O'Grady added to party Roaring Fork Club, LLC(pty:dft) (O'Grady, Kathleen)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Timothy Michael Kratz on behalf of Roaring Fork Club, LLCAttorney Timothy Michael Kratz added to party Roaring Fork Club, LLC(pty:dft) (Kratz, Timothy)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 1 July 2020. Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2020. 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. (cmadr, )
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter for non-dispositive matters. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, and (4) conduct a pretrial conference and enter a pretrial order. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the magistrate judge or on the request of the parties by motion, this court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding, by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 7/1/2020. Text Only Entry (pabsec2)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Harry Leventhal. Roaring Fork Club, LLC waiver sent on 6/26/2020, answer due 8/25/2020. (Bryan, Christopher)
June 25, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer and drawn to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (trvo, )
June 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Roaring Fork Club, LLC (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7359083), filed by Harry Leventhal. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons)(Bryan, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Leventhal v. Roaring Fork Club, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roaring Fork Club, LLC
Represented By: Timothy Michael Kratz
Represented By: Kathleen A. O'Grady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harry Leventhal
Represented By: Christopher David Bryan
Represented By: David Bell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?