Rios v. Select Energy Services, Inc.
Plaintiff: Juan Rios
Defendant: Select Energy Services, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01893
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: William J Martinez
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER Setting Initial Case Deadlines by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/10/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 10/5/2020. (jgonz, )
August 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for August 24, 2020, is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/10/2020. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
August 7, 2020 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Reid, Steven)
August 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michelle Brand Muhleisen on behalf of Select Energy Services, Inc.Attorney Michelle Brand Muhleisen added to party Select Energy Services, Inc.(pty:dft) (Muhleisen, Michelle)
July 29, 2020 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Juan Rios. Select Energy Services, Inc. waiver sent on 7/29/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. (VanLandschoot, Leah)
July 28, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Select Energy Services, Inc., filed by Juan Rios. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline of Amendments)(VanLandschoot, Leah)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 8/24/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 6/30/2020. (ksena)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/ 29/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Magistrate Judge Tafoya, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned to this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). ALSO ORDERED that unless service has otherwise been completed or arranged, Plaintiff's counsel is directed to effect service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure no later than 30 days from the date of this Referral Order, in order for the initial scheduling conference to be held promptly. Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 6/29/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED (jtorr, ) Modified to add text on 6/26/2020 (jtorr, ).
June 26, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge William J. Martinez and drawn to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 26, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Select Energy Services, Inc. (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7360616)Attorney Leah P. VanLandschoot added to party Juan Rios(pty:pla), filed by Juan Rios. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(VanLandschoot, Leah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rios v. Select Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Juan Rios
Represented By: Leah P. VanLandschoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Select Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Michelle Brand Muhleisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?