Nyborg et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Janice Nyborg and Clotilde Szelkowski
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv01918
Filed: June 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Filing 18 Defendant's ANSWER to #14 Amended Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wheeler, Karen)
August 11, 2020 Filing 17 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 7 2020 Letters, #2 Exhibit B - April 9 2020 Letters)(Wheeler, Karen)
July 28, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #10 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Plaintiffs Janice Nyborg, Clotilde Szelkowski. (LaCrue, DezaRae)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing Amended Pleading by Plaintiffs Janice Nyborg, Clotilde Szelkowski (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(LaCrue, DezaRae)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 AMENDED COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Janice Nyborg, Clotilde Szelkowski.(LaCrue, DezaRae)
July 14, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Deaver, Nicholas)
July 14, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF STATE COURT DOCKET SHEET by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Maul, Jami)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to #2 Complaint and Jury Demand by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.(Wheeler, Karen)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 Partial MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Defendant State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - April 7 2020 Letters, #2 Exhibit B - April 9 2020 Letters)(Wheeler, Karen)
July 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Jami Allison Maul on behalf of State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance CompanyAttorney Jami Allison Maul added to party State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Maul, Jami)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/21/2020 11:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/14/2020, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/1/2020. (Attachments: #1 Continuation of Main Document, #2 Continuation of Main Document) (jgonz, )
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER. Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(4), the deadline to file the Consent/Non-Consent to United States Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction form [#4] is September 8, 2020. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/1/2020. Text Only Entry (klmlc2, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Janice Nyborg, Clotilde SzelkowskiAttorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Janice Nyborg(pty:pla), Attorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Clotilde Szelkowski(pty:pla) (LaCrue, DezaRae)
June 30, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jtorr, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, filed by Janice Nyborg, Clotilde Szelkowski.(jtorr, )
June 30, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company from Denver County District Court, Case Number 2020CV31935. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7365241), filed by State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet Supplemental Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Wheeler, Karen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nyborg et al v. State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company
Represented By: Karen Hannah Wheeler
Represented By: Jami Allison Maul
Represented By: Nicholas James Deaver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice Nyborg
Represented By: DezaRae D. LaCrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clotilde Szelkowski
Represented By: DezaRae D. LaCrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?