O'Connor v. Babcock
Plaintiff: Andrew J. O'Connor
Defendant: Lewis T. Babcock
Case Number: 1:2020cv01976
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that Plaintiff cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall obtain and utilize the current Court approved Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) form, available with the applicable instructions, at www.cod.uscourts.gov. If Plaintiff fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/18/2020. (apesa, )
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER Plaintiff has submitted a Complaint (ECF No. #1 ) and an Application to Proceed in District Court without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form) (ECF No. #2 ). There was no case number included in the submitted documents, so the Clerk of Court initiated this new action. It appears Plaintiff may have intended these documents to be filed in his pending action, O'Connor v. Babcock, 20-cv-01722-GPG. Thus, Plaintiff will have twenty-one days from the date of this Minute Order to inform the court, in writing, if he intended for the submitted documents to be filed in his pending action, OConnor v. Babcock, 20-cv-01722-GPG. If he fails to notify the Court within the time allowed, the documents will remain in the instant action. Plaintiff is reminded that the civil action number must appear on all papers that Plaintiff intends to file in an already pending action, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/16/2020. (evana, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Andrew J. O'Connor. (jtorr, )
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lewis T. Babcock, filed by Andrew J. O'Connor.(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Connor v. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lewis T. Babcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew J. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?