Lee v. Denver Public Schools et al
Plaintiff: Tisha Lee
Defendant: David Suppes and Denver Public Schools
Case Number: 1:2020cv01989
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Michael E Hegarty
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331cr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 28 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Tisha Lee. (Allison, Reid)
September 2, 2020 Filing 27 RESPONSE to #16 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND filed by Plaintiff Tisha Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Killmer, Darold)
August 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 31 August 2020. For the Scheduling Conference currently set in this case on September 10, 2020, the Court will permit litigants (counsel and parties) and the public to appear at the conference either in person or by telephone. Anyone appearing in person must comply with General Order 2020-14 governing Court Operations During the COVID-19 Pandemic, which may be accessed at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Anyone appearing by telephone shall call the following conference line at the appointed time: Number: 888-278-0296, Access code: 8212991#. Please remember that, when you call in, you may be entering a proceeding already in progress for a different case; therefore, as you would if you were present in the courtroom, please ensure silence until your case is called. (cmadr, )
August 28, 2020 Filing 25 RESPONSE to #19 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Plaintiff Tisha Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Killmer, Darold)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Renewed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #23 . Plaintiff is granted leave, for good cause shown, to file said Response on or before September 2, 2020. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/20/2020. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 23 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND (Renewed) by Plaintiff Tisha Lee. (Killmer, Darold)
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants Axis and Ensign's Motion for Summary Judgment #21 . Plaintiff's Motion is DENIED without prejudice to refiling given Plaintiff's counsel's failure to serve a copy of the Motion on their clients, as required by D.C.COLO.LCivR 6.1(c) and WJM Revised Practice Standard II.D.2. The Court requires that the certificate of service specifically confirm that service has been made upon moving counsel's client(s) and, if appropriate, identifies the individual who has received service of the motion on behalf of any party which is not a natural person. Finally, Plaintiff's counsel would do well to correct the names of the Defendants, and the type of motion they are responding to, in the title of its refiled motion. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/19/2020. Text Only Entry(wjmsec, )
August 18, 2020 Filing 21 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND by Plaintiff Tisha Lee. (Allison, Reid)
August 12, 2020 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM regarding #19 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by David Suppes, Denver Public Schools. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/12/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 7, 2020 Filing 19 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Denver Public Schools, David Suppes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order Re Motion to Stay)(Gray, Mary)
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/ 30/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Magistrate Judge Hegarty, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 7/30/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
July 29, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND by Defendants Denver Public Schools, David Suppes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Ortiz, Holly)
July 28, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 . All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-01989-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (cmadr, )
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 28 July 2020. Pursuant to the consent form filed by the parties declining consent under the D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(c) #13 , the Court directs the Clerk of the Court to reassign this case under D.C. Colo. LCivR 40.1(a). This Court may continue on the case to hear matters referred by the district judge under 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72 and D.C. Colo. LCivR 72.1(c). (cmadr, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Denver Public Schools, David Suppes All parties do not consent.. (Gray, Mary)
July 14, 2020 *** Denver Public Schools answer due 7/29/2020; David Suppes answer due 7/29/2020. (cmadr, )
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Minute ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 14 July 2020. For good cause shown, Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint and Jury Demand #11 is granted. Defendants shall file an answer or other response to Plaintiffs Complaint on or before July 29, 2020.(cmadr, )
July 13, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND by Defendants Denver Public Schools, David Suppes. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Gray, Mary)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty on 9 July 2020. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall notify all parties who have not entered an appearance of the date and time of the Scheduling Conference. Consent Form due by 8/21/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/10/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2020 10:45 AM in Courtroom A 501 before Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. (cmadr, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Reid Robertson Allison on behalf of Tisha LeeAttorney Reid Robertson Allison added to party Tisha Lee(pty:pla) (Allison, Reid)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Darold W. Killmer on behalf of Tisha LeeAttorney Darold W. Killmer added to party Tisha Lee(pty:pla) (Killmer, Darold)
July 8, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Mary Barham Gray on behalf of Denver Public Schools, David Suppes (Gray, Mary)
July 8, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Holly Eileen Ortiz on behalf of Denver Public Schools, David SuppesAttorney Holly Eileen Ortiz added to party Denver Public Schools(pty:dft), Attorney Holly Eileen Ortiz added to party David Suppes(pty:dft) (Ortiz, Holly)
July 8, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND against Denver Public Schools, David Suppes, filed by Tisha Lee.(jsalz, ) (Main Document 4 replaced on 7/23/2020) (jsalz, ).
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by David Suppes, Denver Public Schools from Denver District Court, Case Number 2020CV32069. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7375059), filed by David Suppes, Denver Public Schools. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit B - Delay Reduction Order, #3 Exhibit C - Entry of Appearance of Holly E. Ortiz, #4 Exhibit D - Entry of Appearance of Mary Gray, #5 Exhibit E - Waiver and Acceptance of Service, #6 Exhibit F - Register of Actions, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gray, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Denver Public Schools et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Suppes
Represented By: Mary Barham Gray
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Denver Public Schools
Represented By: Mary Barham Gray
Represented By: Holly Eileen Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tisha Lee
Represented By: Reid Robertson Allison
Represented By: Darold W. Killmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?