Nelson v. USA
Plaintiff: Andrew James Nelson and Andrew Nelson
Defendant: USA
Case Number: 1:2020cv01993
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO FILE AMENDED COMPLAINT within thirty days from the date of this Order, Plaintiff file an Amended Complaint on a Court- approved Complaint form that complies with the directives in this Order. That if Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint, which complies with the directives in this Order, the Court will dismiss this action without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/19/2020. (evana, )
August 4, 2020 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number COX095960. (jtorr, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That, if Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice. That the Application (Short Form) (ECF No. #3 ) is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE as on the incorrect form, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/9/2020.(evana, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 3 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs by Plaintiff Andrew James Nelson. (agarc, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (agarc, )
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against USA, filed by Andrew James Nelson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(agarc, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nelson v. USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew James Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Nelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?