Ackerman v. No Named Respondents
Petitioner: Edwin Mark Ackerman
Respondent: No Named Respondents
Case Number: 1:2020cv01997
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Lewis T Babcock
Referring Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241fd
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 5 JUDGMENT by Clerk re: #4 Order Dismissing Case on 8/18/2020. (apesa, )
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF DISMISSAL. ORDERED that the action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b) for failure to comply with a Court order and as repetitive. It is FURTHER ORDERED that leave to proceed in forma pauperis on appeal is denied, by Judge Lewis T. Babcock on 8/18/2020. (apesa, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES. ORDERED that Applicant cure the deficiencies designated above within thirty days from the date of this Order if he desires to proceed with a 28 U.S.C. 2241. It is FURTHER ORDERED that if Applicant fails to cure the designated deficiencies within thirty days from the date of this Order the action will be dismissed without further notice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/9/2020. (apesa, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 USC 2241, filed by Edwin Mark Ackerman.(jtorr, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ackerman v. No Named Respondents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: No Named Respondents
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edwin Mark Ackerman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?