Serna v. Cimarron Energy, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexandria Serna
Defendant: Cimarron Energy, Inc., a foreign corporation and Cimarron Energy, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02000
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Christine M Arguello
Referring Judge: Scott T Varholak
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/27/2020. (morti, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 28 MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/27/2020. Discovery due by 2/12/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 3/16/2021. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/25/2021 09:15 AM in Courtroom A 402 before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. FTR: 402. (morti, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/26/2020. (jgonz, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Protective Order. The Court will enter the protective order proposed by the parties with slight modification to Paragraph 11 to clarify the deadline for filing a motion with regard to disputed confidentiality designations. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/26/2020. Text Only Entry(stvlc1, )
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 MEMORANDUM regarding #25 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order filed by Cimarron Energy, Inc. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 8/26/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
August 25, 2020 Filing 25 Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Cimarron Energy, Inc.. (Leh, Christopher)
August 12, 2020 Filing 24 STIPULATION REGARDING ESI PROTOCOL by Defendant Cimarron Energy, Inc.. (Leh, Christopher)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER This matter is set for a Telephonic Scheduling Conference on 8/27/2020 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. The parties shall participate in the conference by calling 888.808.6929 at the scheduled time and utilizing access code: 2805116#. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. SO ORDERED, by Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak on 8/12/2020. Text Only Entry (stvlc1, )
August 12, 2020 Filing 22 CASE REASSIGNED Pursuant to Order of Recusal. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak in the referral role. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02000-CMA-STV. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER OF RECUSAL by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 8/12/2020. The telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 1:30 p.m. before the undersigned Magistrate Judge is VACATED. The Clerk of the Court shall cause this case to be drawn to another Magistrate Judge. (jgonz, )
August 5, 2020 Filing 20 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Cimarron Energy, Inc.. (Leh, Christopher)
August 5, 2020 Filing 19 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Cimarron Energy, Inc. All parties do not consent.. (Leh, Christopher)
August 3, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelli Rae Riley on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Riley, Kelli)
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:re: #16 Notice of Entry of Appearance filed by attorney Kelly Rae Ripley. Attorney has used an incorrect signature format in violation of D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(a) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). REFILE THE DOCUMENT. In the future, the filer must affix an electronic s/signature and s/followed by a typed, not an inked, signature to all future documents. This Document is NOT signed(Text Only Entry) (evana, )
July 27, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kelli Rae Riley on behalf of Alexandria SernaAttorney Kelli Rae Riley added to party Alexandria Serna(pty:pla) (Riley, Kelli)
July 22, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant Cimarron Energy, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Register of Actions)(Leh, Christopher)
July 15, 2020 Filing 14 ANSWER to #4 Complaint by Cimarron Energy, Inc..(Leh, Christopher)
July 13, 2020 Filing 13 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #3 Exhibits, filed by attorney Christopher Leh. The document is incorrectly formatted. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 10.1 (e) Spacing. All pleadings and documents shall be double spaced.(Text Only Entry) (evana, )
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING RULE 16(b) SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 7/10/2020. A telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 8/12/2020 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. All participants shall use the following dial-in information: 888-363-4749, Access Code: 5738976#. The parties shall submit their proposed scheduling order, including a copy of the proposed scheduling order in a Word format sent via email to Wang_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, seven days prior to the Scheduling Conference. (bwilk, )
July 10, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Christopher Marshall Leh on behalf of Cimarron Energy, Inc. (Leh, Christopher)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Magistrate Judge Wang is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b). The parties should expect to be given a firm trial setting that is 90 to 120 days from the date of the final pretrial conference and should be available for trial accordingly. Court-sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. The Magistrate Judge, at his/her discretion, may convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 7/10/2020. Text Only Entry (cmasec)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 Case assigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello and drawn to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time Through and Including July 10, 2020 to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand. By Shannon Lyons, Weld County District Court Judge on 06/09/2020. (jtorr, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 STATE COURT INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (for cases filed on or after July 1,2015). By Shannon Lyons, Weld County District Court Judge on 06/08/2020. (jtorr, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Cimarron Energy, Inc., filed by Alexandria Serna.(jtorr, )
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 Exhibits in Support of #1 Notice of Removal, 2 Administrative Notice, by Defendant Cimarron Energy, Inc., a foreign corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-1 State Court Summons, #2 Exhibit A-2 State Court Complaint, #3 Exhibit A-3 State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Exhibit A-4 State Court Initial Case Management Order, #5 Exhibit A-5 State Court Entry of Appearance of Christopher M. Leh, #6 Exhibit A-6 State Court Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand, #7 Exhibit A-7 State Court Proposed Order to Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand, #8 Exhibit A-8 State Court Order Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint and Jury Demand, #9 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Leh, Christopher)
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 Administrative Notice: Notice to filer of non-compliance with Notice of Removal case opening procedures. It is the responsibility of the attorney or pro se party removing the case to follow Local Rule D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1, and 28 U.S.C. 1446(a). Each of the state court documents shall be individual PDFs. See Appendix B Notice of Removal, in the User Guide - Attorney Case Opening Procedures document. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Cimarron Energy, Inc., a foreign corporation from Weld County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30395. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7377028), filed by Cimarron Energy, Inc., a foreign corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Leh, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Serna v. Cimarron Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cimarron Energy, Inc., a foreign corporation
Represented By: Christopher Marshall Leh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cimarron Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher Marshall Leh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexandria Serna
Represented By: Kelli Rae Riley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?