Shafi v. Colorado Department of Corrections
Plaintiff: Mansoor Shafi
Defendant: State of Colorado and Colorado Department of Corrections
Case Number: 1:2020cv02051
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Alison Faryl Kyles on behalf of Colorado Department of CorrectionsAttorney Alison Faryl Kyles added to party Colorado Department of Corrections(pty:dft) (Kyles, Alison)
September 2, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lucia C. Padilla on behalf of Colorado Department of CorrectionsAttorney Lucia C. Padilla added to party Colorado Department of Corrections(pty:dft) (Padilla, Lucia)
August 4, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mansoor Shafi. Colorado Department of Corrections waiver sent on 7/24/2020, answer due 9/22/2020. (Finger, William)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING INITIAL CASE DEADLINES. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/28/2020. (ksena)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER granting #12 Motion to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference. The Scheduling Conference set for September 14, 2020, is vacated. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/28/2020. Text Only Entry(kmtlc1 )
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #12 Unopposed Motion to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference filed by Mansoor Shafi. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/28/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
July 28, 2020 Filing 12 Unopposed MOTION to Continue Scheduling/Planning Conference by Plaintiff Mansoor Shafi. (Leier, Casey)
July 20, 2020 Filing 11 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES: re: #7 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by attorney Casey James Leier. The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases). (Text Only Entry) (athom, )
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/14/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/17/2020. (ksena)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 7/16/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc1, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 8 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #7 Consent/Non-Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02051-DDD. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Plaintiff Mansoor Shafi All parties do not consent.. (Finger, William)
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of William S. Finger by William Sidney Finger on behalf of Mansoor ShafiAttorney William Sidney Finger added to party Mansoor Shafi(pty:pla) (Finger, William)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jsalz, ) Modified on 7/15/2020 (jsalz, ).
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 CASE REASSIGNED.This case was originally assigned incorrectly, therefore has been randomly reassigned to Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02051-KMT.(Text only entry) (jsalz, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 ADVISORY NOTICE OF NONCOMPLIANCE WITH COURT RULES/PROCEDURES:Casey J. Leier and William Sidney Finger.The s/signature did not match the filers name on the account for which the login and password are registered. DO NOT REFILE THE DOCUMENT. Action to take - future documents must be filed pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 5.1(a) and 4.3(c) of the Electronic Case Filing Procedures (Civil cases).(Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against State of Colorado (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7385910)Attorney William Sidney Finger added to party Mansoor Shafi(pty:pet), filed by Mansoor Shafi. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter, #3 Notice of Related Case)(Finger, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shafi v. Colorado Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansoor Shafi
Represented By: William Sidney Finger
Represented By: Casey James Leier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Department of Corrections
Represented By: Lucia C. Padilla
Represented By: Alison Faryl Kyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?