MacTaggart v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Jennifer MacTaggart
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02059
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER re: #18 Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/8/2020. (jgonz, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 9/8/2020. Discovery due by 4/19/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 5/19/2021. (jgonz, )
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/3/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc3, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE, by Senior Judge Lewis T. Babcock. This case is randomly returned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-2059-DDD (angar, )
September 3, 2020 Filing 15 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Proposed Scheduling Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Lewis T. Babcock. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02059-LTB. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Jennifer MacTaggart. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form)(Lomena, Edward)
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: The Scheduling Conference set for September 9, 2020, is vacated but will not be reset at this time. The parties are still required to file their proposed scheduling order and consent form on September 2, 2020, as directed by the #9 Order. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 8/18/2020. Text Only Entry (kmtlc1 )
July 29, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet State Court Docket Sheet)(Moseley, Jeremy)
July 22, 2020 Filing 11 USAA General Indemnity Company's ANSWER to #5 Complaint by USAA General Indemnity Company.(Moseley, Jeremy)
July 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Edward Lomena on behalf of Jennifer MacTaggartAttorney Edward Lomena added to party Jennifer MacTaggart(pty:pla) (Lomena, Edward)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/9/2020 09:45 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 9/2/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/16/2020. (ksena)
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 STATE COURT ORDER Granting Motion for Extension of Time for Defendant USAA General Indemnity Company to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Plaintiff Jennifer MacTaggart. (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons and complaint upon USAA General Indemnity Company on 6/15/2020, filed by Plaintiff Jennifer MacTaggart (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against USAA General Indemnity Company, filed by Jennifer MacTaggart.(jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Brophy, William)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by USAA General Indemnity Company from District Court, El Paso County, Colorado, Case Number 2020CV30994. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7387838), filed by USAA General Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 State Court - Civil Cover Sheet, #4 State Court - Complaint, #5 State Court - Return of Service, #6 State Court - Order Granting Extension of Time, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moseley, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MacTaggart v. USAA General Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USAA General Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jeremy A. Moseley
Represented By: William Michael Brophy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer MacTaggart
Represented By: Edward Lomena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?