Wallace v. Standard Fire Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Kimberly Wallace
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 1:2020cv02065
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: S Kato Crews
Referring Judge: William J Martinez
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 5/28/2021. Dispositive Motions due by 6/11/2021. Joint Status Report due by 11/16/2020. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/16/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/1/2020. (amont, )
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER The Court attempted to conduct a Scheduling Conference today and due to phone problems and with agreement from counsel, the Scheduling Conference is VACATED and the Court will issue the Scheduling Order. By Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 9/1/2020. Text Only Entry (amont, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Counsel for the parties and all counsel who may later enter an appearance shall review and familiarize themselves with the undersigned's Revised Practice Standards (as most recently revised effective December 1, 2019 and as they may be amended from time to time), which may be downloaded #here. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/ 28/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Magistrate Judge Crews, or such other Magistrate Judge who may in the future be reassigned this case, is designated to conduct NDISPO proceedings pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed.R.Civ.P. 72(a) and (b). Court sponsored alternative dispute resolution is governed by D.C.COLO.LCivR 16.6. On the recommendation or informal request of the Magistrate Judge or on the request of the parties by motion, the court may direct the parties to engage in an early neutral evaluation, a settlement conference, or another alternative dispute resolution proceeding. SO ORDERED by Judge William J. Martinez on 8/28/2020. Text Only Entry (wjmsec, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 16 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to #14 Proposed Scheduling Order. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge William J. Martinez. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02065-WJM. (Text Only Entry) (amont, )
August 25, 2020 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER The upcoming hearing in this matter before Magistrate Judge Crews shall be conducted via telephone. The parties shall call the Court provided conference line as a participant at 888.251.2909, Access Code 5662814# at the scheduled time. The Court notes that the parties may hear the conclusion of a prior hearing at the time they call in, and are instructed to simply wait until their case is called. The Court thanks the parties in advance for their patience and flexibility as the Court implements this new technology. Text Only Entry (amont, )
August 19, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Scheduling Order by Defendant Standard Fire Insurance Company, The. (Laborde, Marianne)
July 22, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to #8 Complaint by Standard Fire Insurance Company, The.(Laborde, Marianne)
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by DezaRae D. LaCrue on behalf of Kimberly WallaceAttorney DezaRae D. LaCrue added to party Kimberly Wallace(pty:pla) (LaCrue, DezaRae)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER Setting Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference. The Scheduling Conference is set for 9/1/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom C201 before Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. The parties shall file their proposed scheduling order, and email a copy in Word format to Crews_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov, on or before 8/25/2020. The Magistrate Judge Consent Form [#10 ] is due 8/25/2020. SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews on 7/6/2020. Text Only Entry (skclc2)
July 15, 2020 Filing 10 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. JD1 and MJ CIV PP flags set. (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Complaint and Summons upon The Standard Fire Insurance Company on 6/15/2020 (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 8 COMPLAINT against Standard Fire Insurance Company, The, filed by Kimberly Wallace.(jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 7 Administrative Notice: Duplicate filing fee received. Financial notified and a refund is pending. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 6 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge S. Kato Crews. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Max K. Jones, Jr on behalf of The Standard Fire Insurance CompanyAttorney Max K. Jones, Jr added to party The Standard Fire Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Jones, Max)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE re #1 Notice of Removal,, Filing of State Court Docket Sheet by Defendant The Standard Fire Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Notice of Filing State Court Docket)(Laborde, Marianne)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Laborde, Marianne)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Standard Fire Insurance Company from Adams County District Court, Case Number 2020cv30760. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7388475), filed by The Standard Fire Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), #2 Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (Policy Dec Pages), #3 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal (CO MVR of Plaintiff), #4 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal (CO Sec of State-Standard Fire), #5 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal (State Court Civil Cover), #6 Exhibit F to Notice of Removal (State Court ROS-Standard Fire), #7 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal (State Court Summons), #8 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet)(Laborde, Marianne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Standard Fire Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Standard Fire Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Max K. Jones, Jr.
Represented By: Marianne Laborde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Wallace
Represented By: DezaRae D. LaCrue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?