Precision Auto Body Repair & Refinishing, Inc. et al v. Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Precision Auto Body Repair & Refinishing, Inc. And Auto Body Partnership, Auto Body Finishing and Precision Auto Body Repair & Refinishing
Defendant: Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2020cv02071
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lelia Kathleen Chaney on behalf of Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance CompanyAttorney Lelia Kathleen Chaney added to party Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company(pty:dft) (Chaney, Lelia)
July 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Derek Lee Fadner on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Derek Lee Fadner added to party Auto Body Finishing(pty:pla), Attorney Derek Lee Fadner added to party Precision Auto Body Repair & Refinishing(pty:pla) (Fadner, Derek)
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/23/20 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 9/21/2020. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 9/28/2020 10:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1, #2 Attachment 2) (nmarb, )
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (cpomm, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER and Jury Demand to #4 Complaint by Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company.(cpomm, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 COMPLAINT and Jury Demand against Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company, filed by Auto Body Finishing, Precision Auto Body Repair & Refinishing.(cpomm, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (Text Only Entry) (cpomm, )
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company from Weld County District Court, Case Number 2020CV30424. (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-7388825), filed by Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Appendix A-1, #3 Appendix A-2, #4 Appendix A-3, #5 Appendix A-4, #6 Appendix A-5, #7 Appendix A-6, #8 Appendix A-7, #9 Appendix A-8, #10 Appendix A-9, #11 Appendix A-10)(West, Jerad)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Precision Auto Body Repair & Refinishing, Inc. et al v. Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colorado Farm Bureau Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Jerad A. West
Represented By: Lelia Kathleen Chaney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Auto Body Repair & Refinishing, Inc. And Auto Body Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auto Body Finishing
Represented By: Derek Lee Fadner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Precision Auto Body Repair & Refinishing
Represented By: Derek Lee Fadner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?