Banks et al v. Jackson
Plaintiff: Lamont Banks, Colorado Springs Fellowship Church, David Banks and Rose Banks
Defendant: Dustin Jackson and Terrelle Jackson
Case Number: 1:2020cv02074
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Daniel D Domenico
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Tafoya
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 RESPONSE to #22 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel filed by Plaintiffs David Banks, Lamont Banks, Rose Banks, Colorado Springs Fellowship Church. (Kleinman, Bernard)
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER REFERRING MOTION: #22 MOTION to Appoint Pro Bono Counsel filed by Terrelle Jackson. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/11/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, )
September 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A) and (B) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(a) and (b), this case is referred to the assigned United States Magistrate Judge to (1) convene a scheduling conference under Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) and enter a scheduling order meeting the requirements of Local Civ. R. 16.2, (2) conduct such status conferences and issue such orders necessary for compliance with the scheduling order, including amendments or modifications of the scheduling order upon a showing of good cause, (3) hear and determine pretrial matters, including discovery and other non-dispositive motions, (4) conduct hearings, including evidentiary hearings, and submit proposed findings of fact and recommendations for rulings on dispositive motions, and (5) pursuant to Local Civ. R. 16.6 and at the discretion of the Magistrate Judge, convene such early neutral evaluation and/or settlement conferences and direct related procedures as may facilitate resolution of this case without the necessity of a motion or prior authorization of the undersigned. SO ORDERED by Judge Daniel D. Domenico on 9/11/2020. Text Only Entry (dddlc2, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF RECUSAL Upon review of the file of this case, I conclude that I must recuse myself from further service in this case because of my past relationship with the parties in this case, This Case has been randomly reassigned to Judge Daniel D. Domenico for all further proceedings, by Judge Christine M. Arguello on 9/10/2020. (evana, ) (Modified on 9/11/2020 edited the text to reflect the correct year to 2020)(evana, ).
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Appointment of Counsel by Defendant Terrelle Jackson. (jgonz, )
September 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(2)(a) re #20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge Christine M. Arguello. All future pleadings should be designated as 20-cv-02074-CMA. (Text Only Entry) (jgonz, )
September 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs David Banks, Lamont Banks, Rose Banks, Colorado Springs Fellowship Church. (Attachments: #1 NOTICE OF MOTION, #2 MEMORANDUM OF LAW)(Kleinman, Bernard)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER: The parties' deadline to file a proposed Scheduling Order and Magistrate Judge consent form is extended to October 5, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/14/20. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER denying #17 Motion to Reconsider Order Granting Defendant Additional Time in Which to Answer Plaintiffs' Complaint. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/14/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
August 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 First MOTION for Reconsideration re Extension of Time Granted Defendant by Plaintiffs David Banks, Lamont Banks, Rose Banks, Colorado Springs Fellowship Church. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Kleinman, Bernard)
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file an answer, or otherwise respond to the #10 Amended Complaint, no later than September 24, 2020. However, Defendant failed to confer with Plaintiffs before filing the present motion. The Tenth Circuit has cautioned that pro se litigants "must follow the same rules of procedure that govern other litigants." Green v. Dorrell, 969 F.2d 915, 917 (10th Cir. 1992). The Local Rules of Practice for the District of Colorado require all parties to confer on motions and other disputes before a motion is filed. D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1A.; see also Visor v. Sprint, No. Civ.A. 96-K-1730, 1997 WL 796989, at *1 (D. Colo. Dec. 31, 1997). The court advises Defendant of the duty to confer, and cautions that any future motions filed without conferring will result in the denial of those motions. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 08/13/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time by Defendant Terrelle Jackson. (jgonz, )
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Colorado Springs Fellowship Church, Rose Banks, David Banks, Lamont Banks. Terrelle Jackson served on 7/22/2020, answer due 8/12/2020. (Kleinman, Bernard)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER granting in part #12 Motion to Adjourn Rule 16 Conference Date, and for Plaintiffs' Counsel to Appear by Telephone or Video. The Scheduling Conference set for September 28, 2020 is VACATED but will not be reset at this time. The parties are still required to file their proposed Scheduling Order and their Magistrate Judge consent form, no later than September 21, 2020, in accordance with the #11 Order. All other deadlines in the #11 Order remain as set. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/22/20. Text Only Entry(kmtlc2)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION for Hearing/Conference re #11 Order to Adjourn Date & Telephone Appearance by Plaintiffs David Banks, Lamont Banks, Rose Banks, Colorado Springs Fellowship Church. (Kleinman, Bernard)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Setting Scheduling Conference for 9/28/2020 10:15 AM in Courtroom 101 (Colorado Springs) before Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Consent Form due by 9/21/2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/21/2020. (ksena)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Terrelle Jackson, filed by Colorado Springs Fellowship Church, Rose Banks, David Banks, Lamont Banks.(Kleinman, Bernard)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER: In light of the #8 Affirmation in Response to the Order to Show Cause, the #7 Order to Show Cause is DISCHARGED. Plaintiffs are directed to file a clean copy of the Amended Complaint, no later than July 22, 2020. By Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 07/21/20. Text Only Entry (kmtlc2)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE & AMENDED COMPLAINT re #7 by Plaintiffs David Banks, Lamont Banks, Rose Banks, Colorado Springs Fellowship Church. (Attachments: #1 Appendix PROPOSED AMENDED COMPLAINT)(Kleinman, Bernard)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 DISCHARGED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: returnable by Plaintiffs why this case should not be dismissed, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1), for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Show Cause Response due by 7/31/2020. by Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya on 7/17/2020. (jgonz, ) Modified on 7/23/2020 to discharge pursuant to Minute Order #9 (jgonz, ).
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Kathleen M. Tafoya. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS REQUEST as to DUSTIN JACKSON re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs LAMONT BANKS, David Banks, Rose M. Banks, Colorado Springs Fellowship Church. (Kleinman, Bernard)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS REQUEST as to TERRELLE JACKSON re #1 Complaint,, by Plaintiffs LAMONT BANKS, David Banks, Rose M. Banks, Colorado Springs Fellowship Church. (Kleinman, Bernard)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent Colorado Springs Fellowship Church for Colorado Springs Fellowship Church. (Kleinman, Bernard)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DUSTIN JACKSON, TERRELLE JACKSON (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7388986)Attorney Bernard V. Kleinman added to party LAMONT BANKS(pty:pla), Attorney Bernard V. Kleinman added to party David Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Bernard V. Kleinman added to party Rose M. Banks(pty:pla), Attorney Bernard V. Kleinman added to party Colorado Springs Fellowship Church(pty:pla), filed by Colorado Springs Fellowship Church, Rose M. Banks, David Banks, LAMONT BANKS. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kleinman, Bernard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Banks et al v. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamont Banks
Represented By: Bernard V. Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colorado Springs Fellowship Church
Represented By: Bernard V. Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Banks
Represented By: Bernard V. Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rose Banks
Represented By: Bernard V. Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrelle Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?