Tsangarakis v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: Matthew G. Tsangarakis
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2020cv02090
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - DIWC/DIWW (405(g))
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pruett, Richard)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting #4 Application To Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/20/20. (athom, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re: #1 Complaint, filed by Matthew G. Tsangarakis. Opening and response briefs shall be limited to no more than twenty (20) pages. Reply briefs shall be limited to no more than ten (10) pages. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/20/2020. (athom, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 9/15/2020. Text Only Entry (athom, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff Matthew G. Tsangarakis. (Robinson, Kathleen)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Administrative Notice: No filing fee received with case opening. Attorney contacted with instructions to submit filing fee or docket the Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepayment of Fees or Costs as a separate docket entry within 3 hours. (Text Only Entry) (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M SAUL. Attorney Kathleen W. Robinson added to party Matthew G. Tsangarakis (pty:pla), filed by Matthew G. Tsangarakis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Kathleen) Modified to correct title on 7/17/2020 (jtorr, ). Modified on 7/20/2020 to correct filer and to note that this is a duplicate filing of doc #1 (athom, ).
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M SAUL. Attorney Kathleen Winter Robinson added to party Matthew G. Tsangarakis(pty:pla), filed by Matthew G. Tsangarakis. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Robinson, Kathleen) Modified on 7/20/2020 to correct filer (athom, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tsangarakis v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: Richard W. Pruett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew G. Tsangarakis
Represented By: Kathleen Winter Robinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?