Hadi v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Plaintiff: ZAINAB HADI
Defendant: ANDREW M SAUL and Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Interested Party: SSA Noticing and USAO-SS-Noticing
Case Number: 1:2020cv02095
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Robert E Blackburn
Nature of Suit: Social Security - SSID Title XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Commissioner, Social Security Administration. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Blower, David)
September 8, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by J. Benedict Garcia on behalf of Commissioner, Social Security AdministrationAttorney J. Benedict Garcia added to party Commissioner, Social Security Administration(pty:dft) (Garcia, J.)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting #2 Application To Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/21/2020. (athom, )
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re: #1 Complaint filed by Zainab Hadi. Opening and response briefs shall be limited to no more than twenty (20) pages. Reply briefs shall be limited to no more than ten (10) pages. By Judge Robert E. Blackburn on 07/21/2020. (athom, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 Utility Setting Deadlines: Commissioner, Social Security Administration answer due 9/15/2020. Text Only Entry (athom, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 Administrative Notice: Social Security Case Service. Pursuant to the Letter of Agreement signed by the Clerk, U.S. District Court;U.S. Attorneys Office for the District of Colorado (USAO), and Social Security Administration (SSA), service of the initiating document(s) by the plaintiff to the SSA, the U.S. Attorney General, and USAO in accordance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 4(i) is not necessary unless the court otherwise orders. A summons is not required and will not be issued. (Text Only Entry) (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 4 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn. Text Only Entry (jsalz, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs. by Plaintiff ZAINAB HADI. (Lopes, Jenna)
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M SAUL Attorney Jenna D. Lopes added to party ZAINAB HADI(pty:pla), filed by ZAINAB HADI. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Lopes, Jenna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hadi v. Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ZAINAB HADI
Represented By: Jenna D. Lopes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner, Social Security Administration
Represented By: David I. Blower
Represented By: J. Benedict Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: SSA Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: USAO-SS-Noticing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?