Bruce v. City and County of Denver et al
Plaintiff: Douglas Bruce
Defendant: State of Colorado, City and County of Denver, Machol & Johannes LLC, Sterling Consulting Corporation and Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
Case Number: 1:2020cv02099
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: R Brooke Jackson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Lauren Eileen Davison on behalf of State of ColoradoAttorney Lauren Eileen Davison added to party State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Davison, Lauren)
August 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint. State of Colorado's answer or response to the Complaint is now due by 10/1/2020. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 8/28/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
August 27, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond re #1 Complaint, by Defendant State of Colorado. (Colony, Amy)
August 27, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Amy Christine Colony on behalf of State of ColoradoAttorney Amy Christine Colony added to party State of Colorado(pty:dft) (Colony, Amy)
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (apesa, )
July 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS REQUEST as to State of Colorado, City and County of Denver, Fairfield & Woods P.C, Machol & Johannes, LLC,Sterling Consulting Corporation by Plaintiff Douglas Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Summons Summons City and County of Denver, #2 Summons Summons Fairfield & Woods, #3 Summons Summons Machol & Johannes, #4 Summons Summons Sterling Consulting)(Garcia, Nathan)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER Due to the COVID-19 pandemic the Court will not hold a Scheduling Conference. The Court requests that counsel confer and attempt to agree on a schedule and submit a proposed scheduling order 45 days after an answer or response to the complaint is filed pointing out any areas of disagreement. Please email the proposed order to Jackson_Chambers@cod.uscourts.gov in Word format and efile into CM/ECF. The Court will review the proposed order and make such rulings as are appropriate and will provide the parties with potential trial preparation conference and trial dates for you to choose from. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 7/21/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). NO SUMMONS ISSUED. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson and drawn to Magistrate Judge Scott T. Varholak. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City and County of Denver, Fairfield & Woods, P.C., Machol & Johannes LLC, State of Colorado, Sterling Consulting Corporation (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7392360)Attorney Nathan R. Garcia added to party Douglas Bruce(pty:pla), filed by Douglas Bruce. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Garcia, Nathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bruce v. City and County of Denver et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Colorado
Represented By: Amy Christine Colony
Represented By: Lauren Eileen Davison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Machol & Johannes LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sterling Consulting Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairfield & Woods, P.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas Bruce
Represented By: Nathan R. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?