Heard v. Synergy Credit Services LLC et al
Plaintiff: Burnis Heard
Defendant: Synergy Credit Services, LLC, Michael Kasick, Jennifer Kasick and Synergy Credit Services LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv02102
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: N Reid Neureiter
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2020 Filing 7 Defendants' ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by Jennifer Kasick, Michael Kasick, Synergy Credit Services LLC.(Reiner, David)
August 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by David P. Reiner, II on behalf of Jennifer Kasick, Michael Kasick, Synergy Credit Services LLCAttorney David P. Reiner, II added to party Jennifer Kasick(pty:dft), Attorney David P. Reiner, II added to party Michael Kasick(pty:dft), Attorney David P. Reiner, II added to party Synergy Credit Services LLC(pty:dft) (Reiner, David)
August 7, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Notice of Change of Law Firm Affiliation and Substitution of Counsel by Plaintiff Burnis Heard (Savidge, David)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE AND SETTING DEADLINE FOR FILING OF CONSENT/NON-CONSENT FORM by Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter on 20 July 2020. Consent Form due by 9/22/2020. Proposed Scheduling Order due 9/29/2020. Scheduling Conference set for 10/6/2020 09:30 AM in Courtroom C203 before Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. The Scheduling Conference will be conducted via telephone. The parties are directed to call the conference line as a participant at (888) 398-2342, Access Code 5755390# at the scheduled time. (cmadr, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge N. Reid Neureiter. Text Only Entry. (jtorr, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Original against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-7392472)Attorney David H. Savidge added to party Burnis Heard(pty:pla), filed by Burnis Heard. (Attachments: #1 Summons Re Synergy Credit Services, LLC, #2 Summons Re Michael Kasick, #3 Summons Re Jennifer Kasick, #4 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Savidge, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heard v. Synergy Credit Services LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Burnis Heard
Represented By: David H. Savidge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Credit Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kasick
Represented By: David P. Reiner, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Kasick
Represented By: David P. Reiner, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Synergy Credit Services LLC
Represented By: David P. Reiner, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?