Dorn v. Carpenter et al
Plaintiff: Thomas James Dorn
Defendant: City and County of Denver, Jefferson County Court and Verna Carpenter
Case Number: 1:2020cv02103
Filed: July 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Colorado
Presiding Judge: Gordon P Gallagher
Referring Judge: Kristen L Mix
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 14, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to Consolidate Cases and Opposition to Motion to Dismiss, by Plaintiff Thomas James Dorn. (nmarb, )
September 14, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Thomas James Dorn. Verna Carpenter served on 9/8/2020, answer due 9/29/2020, for #5 First Amended Complaint. (nmarb, )
September 10, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Consolidate Cases 20-cv-02501-MEH and 20-cv-02103-KLM, by Plaintiff Thomas James Dorn. (nmarb, )
September 8, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Order for Summons for Verna Carpenter, by Plaintiff Thomas James Dorn. (Attachments: #1 duplicative 2nd motion)(nmarb, )
September 2, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Verna Carpenter, City and County of Denver, Jefferson County Court, filed by Thomas James Dorn, pursuant to #11 Order. (nmarb, )
August 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/30/20 DENYING #6 Objection to Using a Court Form and Motion for Rehearing; DENYING #2 Motion to the Court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Amended Complaint [#5] is deficient as identified in this Order. Plaintiff shall file a new Amended Complaint by September 15, 2020, that is on the proper Court form and that complies with Fed. R. Civ. P. 8. If Plaintiff fails to file the Amended Complaint on the proper Court form, this case will be dismissed without prejudice and without further notice.(nmarb, )
August 26, 2020 Filing 10 SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/26/2020: #2 Envelope) (nmarb, ).
August 11, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (evana, )
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DRAWING CASE. The court has determined that this case does not appear to be appropriate for review pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(a). Therefore, the case will be drawn to a presiding judge and, if applicable, to a magistrate judge. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 8.1(c). Pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1 (d) (1), the case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Accordingly, it is ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(d)(1), by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 8/7/2020. (evana, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 7 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number COX095933 for Thomas Dorn (evana, )
August 3, 2020 Filing 6 Objection to Using a Court Form and MOTION for Rehearing by Plaintiff Thomas James Dorn. (evana, )
July 20, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Verna Carpenter, City and County of Denver, Jefferson County Court, filed by Thomas James Dorn.(evana, )
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO CURE DEFICIENCIES within thirty (30) days from the date of this order. Any papers that Plaintiff files in response to this order must include the civil action number on this order. That, if Plaintiff fails to cure all of the designated deficiencies within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, the action will be dismissed without further notice. The dismissal shall be without prejudice, by Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher on 7/20/2020. (evana, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Gordon P. Gallagher. Text Only Entry (cpomm, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to the Court by Plaintiff Thomas James Dorn. (cpomm, )
July 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Verna Carpenter, Jefferson County Court, City and County of Denver, filed by Thomas James Dorn. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Law offices of Anthony H. Veto, #2 Notice of Appearance, #3 Oath of Office, #4 Permanent Civil Protection Order, #5 Sworn Affidavid, #6 Cover Letters, #7 Envelope)(cpomm, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Colorado District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dorn v. Carpenter et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City and County of Denver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jefferson County Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Verna Carpenter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas James Dorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?